Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00277
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2021
Last checked: Saturday May 29, 2021 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Brown (8)
Represented By
Sydney Strickland Saffold
Saffold Law
contact info
Defendant
Jovanna Brown (3)
Represented By
Michael J. Goldberg
Law Office Of Michael J. Goldberg
contact info
Defendant
Adrienne Campbell (2)
Represented By
Stephen McGowan
contact info
Jeffrey P. Saffold
contact info
Defendant
Glenn King, Jr. (6)
Defendant
Shirley Ladson (7)
Represented By
Tiana Bohanon
Friedman & Nemecek
contact info
Brad S. Wolfe
Friedman & Nemecek
contact info
Defendant
James Luke (5)
Defendant
Marcellus Smith (4)
Defendant
Diontae Wallace (1)
Represented By
Marcus S. Sidoti
Friedman, Gilbert & Gerhardstein
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Brad J. Beeson
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info

GPO May 05 2022
Report and Recommendation on Plea of Guilty as to Glenn King, Jr (6). Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 5/19/2022. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 5/5/2022. (D,JJ)
GPO Aug 10 2022
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation as to Glenn King, Jr (6). Defendant is adjudged guilty of Count 20 of the Indictment, Aggravated Identity Theft, in violation of Title 18 U.S.C. § 1028A(a)(1). This matter was referred to U.S. Pretrial Services and Probation for the completion of a pre-sentence investigation and report. Sentencing will take place on August 18, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. via video conference. (Related document 143.) Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/10/2022. (M,CE)

Docket last updated: 05/29/2021 4:21 AM EDT
Monday, April 20, 2020
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 4/20/2020 as to Diontae Wallace (1). (S,S) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
Arrest of Diontae Wallace (1) on 4/22/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Diontae Wallace (1). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Diontae Wallace (1). Attorney Ranya Elzein for United States of America; Marcus S. Sidoti for Diontae Wallace added. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Initial Appearance as to Diontae Wallace (1) held on 4/22/2020. All parties appeared via video/telephone conference. Ranya Elzein present as counsel for the government. Marcus Sidoti present as retained counsel for the defendant. Also present, Pretrial Services Officer Travis Jennings. Defendant consented to participating via video conference, with no objection from defense counsel or government. A Preliminary Examination was set for 4/27/2020 at 11:00 AM to be held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Instructions for accessing the video hearing will be emailed to all counsel of record. The government did not move for detention. The court set bond at $20,000 unsecured with standard and special conditions. Defendant also consented on the record to having Attorney Sidoti sign the bond documents on his behalf. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal until notified by the clerk or judge that that the conditions of release have been satisfied. (Court Reporter: L. Boardman. Time: 20 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to Diontae Wallace (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 4/22/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
5 5 Appearance Bond Entered as to Diontae Wallace (1) in amount of $ $20,000.00, unsecured. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Diontae Wallace (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 4/23/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/22/2020 in case as to Diontae Wallace (1). (L,MI) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Diontae Wallace (1). (D,JJ) (D,JJ). [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/6/2020) Corrected Main Document
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
9 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Indict by United States of America as to Diontae Wallace (1).(Elzein, Ranya) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 14, 2020
10 10 Waiver of Speedy Trial by Diontae Wallace (1). (Sidoti, Marcus) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
11 11 Waiver of Speedy Trial by Diontae Wallace (1). (Sidoti, Marcus) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order to Continue - Ends of Justice as to Diontae Wallace (1). The time period of May 22, 2020 to the date that is 30 days after the date that this Court permits grand juries in the Northern District of Ohio to resume meeting and proceed generally, in the normal course, communicated through a new General Order, inclusive, is hereby excluded in computing the time for all Speedy Trial Act purposes, including but not limited to the time within which an indictment or information must be filed 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 5/15/2020. Related [+] (S,S) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-] lated document9
Monday, June 29, 2020
14 14 Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release by Diontae Wallace (1). (Sidoti, Marcus) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
Order [non-document] granting defendant's14 Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release. The Home Incarceration component of release is terminated. Defendant shall comply with all remaining conditions of release as previously set. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/1/2020. (S,S) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
15 15 Notice of Substitution of Attorney. Ranya Elzein removed from case, Kathryn Gaughan Andrachik appearing for USA.(Andrachik, Kathryn) [1:20-mj-04128-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (H,SP)
Related: [-]
16 16 UNSEALED INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Diontae Wallace (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 15, Adrienne Campbell (2) count(s) 1, 6-7, 16, Jovanna Brown (3) count(s) 1, 8-9, 17, Marcellus Smith (4) count(s) 1, 10, 18, James Luke (5) count(s) 1, 11, 19, Glenn King, Jr (6) count(s) 1, 12, 20, Shirley Ladson (7) count(s) 1, 13, 21, Joseph Brown (8) count(s) 1, 14, 22. (H,SP) Case Unsealed on 5/4/2021 (L,Ja).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page
18 18 Motion to Seal Indictment filed by United States of America as to Diontae Wallace (1), Adrienne Campbell (2), Jovanna Brown (3), Marcellus Smith (4), James Luke (5), Glenn King, Jr (6), Shirley Ladson (7), Joseph Brown (8). (H,SP)
Related: [-]
19 19 Order granting the government's18 Motion to Seal Indictment until the arrest of any defendant as to Diontae Wallace (1), Adrienne Campbell (2), Jovanna Brown (3), Marcellus Smith (4), James Luke (5), Glenn King Jr. (6), Shirley Ladson (7), Joseph Brown (8). Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/29/2021. (H,SP)
Related: [-]