FENWICK v. SOTHEBY'S
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Evelyn Padin |
Referred: | Jessica S Allen |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-11987 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 26, 2021 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
SOTHEBY'S
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
FRANCIS FENWICK
|
Represented By
|
![]() OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/4/2022. (ld, ) |
|
![]() OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 11/17/2022. (ld, ) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2023 | ||
72 | 72
![]() Letter from plaintiff's counsel, Barry J. Gainey, Esq. regarding stipulation of dismissal that was indavertently filed under seal re70 Stipulation of Dismissal (aty),,. (GAINEY, BARRY) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
71 | 71
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 4l(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/17/2023. (ld, ) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
70 | 70
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by plaintiff pursuant to settlement agrrement by FRANCIS FENWICK. (GAINEY, BARRY) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |