Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-00102

Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 3:21-ap-90006
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Glenn E Lockwood
Represented By
Glenn E Lockwood
contact info
Defendant
Saray C Lockwood
Represented By
Saray C Lockwood
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Kathryn Perkins
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM AKDT
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/06 2:11 PM
Adversary Case Closed.(JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
23 23 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (SA) Thu 03/31 11:41 AM
Ex Parte Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint,22 Order (SA)
utility Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed) Thu 03/31 1:56 PM
Calendar Remark - the pre-trial conference set for 5/31/2022 and the trial set for 6/21/2022 are removed from the calendar as this case has been dismissed. Related [+].(SV)
Related: [-] DE#14 Order Setting Trial (SA)
Thursday, March 24, 2022
22 22 2 pgs order Order (Generic) (SA) Thu 03/24 12:03 PM
[COPY OF ORDER from maincase A19-00102-GS] Order Granting Joint Motion By United States Trustee and Debtors To Approve Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
utility Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) Tue 11/23 2:45 PM
OrderDuePty flag removed - order entered denying motion to dismiss. Related [+].(SV)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,20 Proceeding Memo,21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, November 22, 2021
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/22 3:24 PM
Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (JL)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, November 18, 2021
19 19 audio Audio File (Active Event) Thu 11/18 3:45 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/17/2021 2:08:33 PM ]. File Size [ 24272 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:50:34 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline Thu 11/18 9:13 AM
Utility Event to Terminate Deadline(s) Re: objections due as it has passed and is stale. Related [+].(MW)
Related: [-] DE#16 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
20 20 court Proceeding Memo Fri 11/19 9:46 AM
**Order Due** Proceeding Memo Re: Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Or, In the Alternative, Motion To Stay Adversary Proceeding Pending Ruling on Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Chapter 7 Case. **See proceeding memo for specifics/rulings.** Order Due From Party Set 11/17/2021. Related [+]. (MW)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
18 18 notice Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline) Wed 11/17 8:32 AM
Notice of Filing Supplemental Evidence in Support of Motion to Dismiss . Related [+]. Filed by Wayne G. Dawson on behalf of Glenn E Lockwood, Saray C Lockwood.(Dawson, Wayne)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit Grand Jury Subpoena - Glenn Lockwood
Att: 2 Exhibit Grand Jury Subpoena - Saray Lockwood
Att: 3 Exhibit First Set of Discovery to Glenn Lockwood
Att: 4 Exhibit First Set of Discovery to Saray Lockwood
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
17 17 misc Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed) Tue 11/09 11:53 AM
Objection to Motion to Dismiss Adversary . Related [+]. Filed by Kathryn Perkins on behalf of United States Trustee.(Perkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
utility Update Deadline (Objections - all types) Tue 11/02 8:26 AM
Updated Objection Deadline per DE#16 Notice of Hearing on DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections due by 11/17/2021. (LD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
16 16 notice Hearing Mon 11/01 5:44 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss . Hearing set for 11/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Related [+]. Filed by Wayne G. Dawson on behalf of Glenn E Lockwood, Saray C. Lockwood.(Dawson, Wayne) Modified on 11/2/2021 - to add filer Saray C. Lockwood. (Bennett, Maia)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, October 28, 2021
15 15 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (CM15) Thu 10/28 3:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Wayne G. Dawson on behalf of Glenn E Lockwood.(Dawson, Wayne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
utility Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) Tue 10/05 7:58 AM
OrderDueCt flag removed. Related [+].(SV)
Related: [-] DE#13 Proceeding Memo,14 Order Setting Trial (SA)
Monday, October 04, 2021
14 14 order Setting Trial (SA) Mon 10/04 4:25 PM
Order Setting Trial and Related Deadlines. Trial set for 6/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Joinder of Other Parties or Amendments of Pleadings due by 10/13/2021. Disclosures Rule26(a)(1) (Initial Disclosures) shall be made on or before 10/22/2021. Disclosures Rule26(a)(2) (Expert Testimony) shall be made on or before 2/20/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2022. Discovery closes 4/6/2022. Disclosures Rule26(a)(3) (Witness/Exhibit Lists) shall be made on or before 5/31/2022. Trial Briefs due by 5/31/2022. Witness Lists due by 5/31/2022. Exhibit Lists & Exhibits filed by 5/31/2022. Objections to exhibits due by 6/6/2022. Related [+].(MW)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint,13 Proceeding Memo
Thursday, September 30, 2021
12 12 audio Audio File (Active Event) Thu 09/30 3:45 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/29/2021 1:31:48 PM ]. File Size [ 10688 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:22:16 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
13 13 court Proceeding Memo Mon 10/04 4:11 PM
**Order Due** Proceeding Memo Re: CONTINUED Scheduling and Planning Conference. **See proceeding memo for specifics/rulings.** Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Trial set for 6/21/2022 at 09:30 AM. Order Due From Court Set 9/29/2021. Related [+]. (MW)
Related: [-] DE#9 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
11 11 audio Audio File (Active Event) Wed 08/25 3:45 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/25/2021 1:30:48 PM ]. File Size [ 2264 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:43 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Proceeding Memo Wed 08/25 2:55 PM
Proceeding Memo Re: Scheduling and Planning Conference. **See proceeding memo for specifics/rulings.** Scheduling and Planning Conference is continued to 9/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Related [+]. (JL)
Related: [-] DE#9 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Monday, August 02, 2021
9 9 order Setting Hearing (SA) Mon 08/02 3:25 PM
Order Setting Initial Scheduling And Planning Conference. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 8/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Related [+].(LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Friday, July 30, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint (APANS01) Fri 07/30 11:27 AM
Answer to Complaint to Deny Debtors' Discharge . Filed by Wayne G. Dawson on behalf of Glenn E Lockwood, Saray C Lockwood.(Dawson, Wayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 07/16 6:06 AM
Stipulation Between United States Trustee and Debtors' Counsel, Re: Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Extending Deadline to July 30, 2021. . Related [+]. Filed by Kathryn Perkins on behalf of United States Trustee.(Perkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-] DE#5 Stipulation
utility Update Deadline (Reset Adversary Answer) Fri 07/16 9:43 AM
Glenn E Lockwood Answer Deadline Reset for 7/30/2021. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#2 Summons Issued,7 Stipulation
utility Update Deadline (Reset Adversary Answer) Fri 07/16 9:47 AM
Saray C Lockwood Answer Deadline Reset for 7/30/2021. Related [+]
Related: [-] DE#3 Summons Issued.(JL). Related document(s)7 Stipulation. Modified on 7/16/2021 to correct linking. (Bennett, Maia)
Thursday, July 15, 2021
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 07/15 4:06 PM
*** Notice of Appearance. Filed by Wayne G. Dawson on behalf of Glenn E Lockwood, Saray C Lockwood.(Dawson, Wayne)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
utility Update Deadline (Reset Adversary Answer) Mon 06/21 10:15 AM
Glenn E Lockwood Answer Deadline Reset for 7/16/2021 per RE: DE#2 Summons Issued and5 Stipulation. (LD)
Related: [-]
utility Update Deadline (Reset Adversary Answer) Mon 06/21 10:17 AM
Saray C Lockwood Answer Deadline Reset for 7/16/2021 per RE: DE#3 Summons Issued and5 Stipulation. (LD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 06/18 7:20 AM
Stipulation Between United States Trustee and Glen & Saray Lockwood Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint to July 16, 2021, Re: . Related [+]. Filed by Kathryn Perkins on behalf of United States Trustee.(Perkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/08 6:59 AM
Certificate of Service of . Related [+]. Filed by US Trustee.(Gustafson, Cori)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued,3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 06/02 1:49 PM
COPY of Summons Issued on Saray C. Lockwood Date Issued 6/2/2021, Answer Due 7/2/2021. (JL)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 06/02 1:49 PM
COPY of Summons Issued on Glenn E. Lockwood Date Issued 6/2/2021, Answer Due 7/2/2021. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Used in Open AP Case) Tue 06/01 11:43 AM
Adversary case 21-90006 Complaint to Deny Debtors' Discharge by United States Trustee for Region 18 against Glenn E Lockwood, Saray C Lockwood. Fee Amount $350. Filed by Kathryn Perkins. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e);Rule 7001(4))) (Perkins, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary Cover Sheet
utility Adversary Review Completed Tue 06/01 2:39 PM
Adversary Review Completed. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint