Starling v. Straight Marketing, LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 6:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Straight Marketing, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Starling
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/06 8:33 AM
ORDER... Plaintiff has had ample time to file a motion for default judgment and has been urged to do so by a Court order. See ECF No.8 . He has declined. Therefore, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and for lack of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/5/2021) (wxc) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Fri 08/06 12:27 PM
Civil Case Terminated Per Order11 . (wxc) |
||
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 07/26 12:08 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Straight Marketing, LLC. (pef) |
|
Saturday, July 24, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Sat 07/24 12:56 PM
Request for Clerk to issue entry of default filed by Kimberly Starling. (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) | ||
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/15 8:42 AM
ORDER...The docket sheet reflects that Defendant Straight Market, LLC, was served with the Complaint on June 22, 2021. See ECF No. 6. To date, Defendant has failed to appear in this matter. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to move for entry of default and default judgment against Painter (see Fed. R. Civ. P. 55) on or before July 30, 2021. Otherwise, the Court may dismiss Plaintiffs claims against Defendant for want of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/14/2021) (wxc) |
|
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/12 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob U Ginsburg on behalf of Kimberly Starling. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
service
Summons Returned
Tue 06/29 9:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Straight Marketing, LLC ; served on 6/22/2021. (Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/02 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Straight Marketing, LLC. (tln) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES)
Wed 06/02 2:47 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/02 1:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Starling. (Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request for Clerk to Issue Document
Wed 06/02 1:43 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Kimberly Starling. (Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/02 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Straight Marketing, LLC filed by Kimberly Starling. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11942175) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ginsburg, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |