Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:21-cv-11311
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2021
Terminated:Jun 25, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 30, 2021 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Concord Consumer Co-Op
Defendant
Marcus Mgmt.
Defendant
U.S.P.S.D.C. [Trenton]
Plaintiff
Le'Netta Stone
22846 Nadyne
Brownstown Twp., MI 48183

GPO Jun 25 2021
ORDER Granting 8 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Le'Netta Stone and SUMMARILY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, June 25, 2021
9 9 order Dismissing Case Fri 06/25 3:41 PM
ORDER Granting8 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Le'Netta Stone and SUMMARILY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 06/25 3:43 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Order on Le'Netta Stone at 22846 Nadyne, Brownstown Twp., MI 48183 (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
8 8 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 06/21 12:06 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Le'Netta Stone. (RLou)
Related: [-]
7 7 trial Exhibit Mon 06/21 11:14 AM
EXHIBITS in support of1 Complaint by Le'Netta Stone (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
6 6 trial Exhibit Index Tue 06/15 12:34 PM
INDEX of Exhibits With Additional Exhibits re1 Complaint,5 Exhibit,3 Exhibit by Le'Netta Stone. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
5 5 trial Exhibit Thu 06/10 11:05 AM
ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS re1 Complaint by Le'Netta Stone (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Fri 06/04 10:41 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
3 3 trial Exhibit Thu 06/03 1:47 PM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, by Le'Netta Stone (RLou)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 06/03 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Le'Netta Stone against defendants (DPer)
Related: [-]
misc Deficiency - Non-Prisoner Thu 06/03 1:10 PM
Deficiency directed to Le'Netta Stone : Initiating document filed without any form of payment or Application for In Forma Pauperis. (DPer)
Related: [-]