North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 3:21-cv-00260
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2021
Terminated:Jan 24, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 30, 2021 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
DCN Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff
Andrew Becvar
Represented By
James J. Parr
Agruss Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Shireen Hormozdi
Hormozdi Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/05 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Andrew Becvar (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/16 11:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Settlement Deadline 4/15/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/15 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Andrew Becvar (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/04 1:54 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: one to two days. Discovery due by 5/22/2023. Mediation deadline set for 6/9/2023. Motions due by 6/22/2023. Ready Date for Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/4/2023. (mek)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
22 22 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Fri 12/30 4:16 PM
CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Fri 12/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/6/2023. (ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/15 9:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by DCN Holdings, Inc..(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
20 20 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment Mon 11/21 10:09 AM
ORDER granting 14 Defendants Motion for Relief from Judgement. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/18/2022. (ams)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/25 7:32 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by DCN Holdings, Inc.. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/18 6:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Andrew Becvar. Replies due by 10/25/2022(Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Florida Profit Corporation Annual Report, filed February 4, 2021,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Non-Service of Maranatha Bedford,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Non-Service of Edwin Young,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs counsels cover letter to the Florida Secretary of State,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - July 23, 2021 correspondence from the Florida Secretary of State,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Defendants 2022 Florida Profit Corporation Amended Annual Report, filed February 24, 2022
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/11 5:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:14 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Andrew Becvar. Responses due by 10/25/2022 (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/11 6:58 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 14 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment. Responses due by 10/18/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/11/2022. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/05 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by DCN Holdings, Inc. re14 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/27 1:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCN Holdings, Inc. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Set Aside Judgment Tue 09/27 1:23 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by DCN Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/27 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Kyle Aust on behalf of DCN Holdings, Inc. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 01/24 1:41 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/24/2022. (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
11 11 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/22 1:22 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, DCN Holdings, Inc. by Andrew Becvar. (Parr, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Attorney Fee Survey,
Att: 3 Affidavit Attorney's Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Statement of Services,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order and Judgment
Monday, November 22, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/22 2:40 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James J. Parr for Andrew Becvar. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/22/2021. (mek)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Mon 11/22 12:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James J. Parr Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5327811. by Andrew Becvar. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Dates of Admission
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
8 8 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/17 8:51 AM
Deleted. Duplicate entry docketed in error. 8/17/2021 (ams)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/17 8:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DCN Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (eef)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
6 6 motion Entry of Default Mon 08/16 1:19 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Andrew Becvar. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/27 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Becvar. DCN Holdings, Inc. served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/04 2:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew Becvar (Hormozdi, Shireen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/03 3:26 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to DCN Holdings, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/03 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Andrew Becvar (Hormozdi, Shireen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/03 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT against DCN Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5059836), filed by Andrew Becvar.(Hormozdi, Shireen) Modified extra wording on 6/3/2021 (js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/03 3:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (js)
Related: [-]