New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Referred: Andrew E Krause
Case #: 7:21-cv-04863
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2021
Terminated:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 29, 2021 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
Celtic Services NYC Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Mendoza
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kieran Slevin
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Defendant
White Star NYC Inc.
Represented By
Michael K. Chong
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Fidel Penate
Represented By
Jian Hang
Hang & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Qinyu Fan
Hang & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Jiajing Fan
Hang & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
48 48 order Judgment Tue 07/26 3:00 PM
JUDGMENT. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: That the Plaintiff, Fidel Penate, has judgment against Defendants Celtic Services NYC Inc., White Star NYC Inc., Kieran Slevin and Carlos Mendoza jointly and severally, in the amount of $110,000.00, (One hundred and Ten Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents) which is inclusive of attorneys' fees and costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/26/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
47 47 misc Letter Mon 07/25 11:38 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Oscar Alvarado dated 07/25/2022 re: Proposed Judgment. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Alvarado, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Yu v. Hasaki Restaurant
46 46 order Memo Endorsement Mon 07/25 3:42 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:44 Proposed Judgment filed by Fidel Penate. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will not sign this proposed judgment, given that this is an FLSA case and the Parties have not attempted to satisfy the requirement of Cheeks. The Parties are to advise the Court by 8/1/22 how they wish to proceed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/25/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 07/25 9:04 AM
ORDER In light of the reported acceptance of the Rule 68 offer of judgment, the conference with Magistrate Judge Krause scheduled for August 1, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (Text Only Order) (md)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
44 44 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 07/22 10:32 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Re: Document No.43 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Hang, Jian)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 07/22 10:30 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Hang, Jian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 68 Offer of Judgment
order Scheduling Order Fri 07/22 4:00 PM
RESCHEDULING ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for 8/1/2022 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Krause is hereby rescheduled to 8/1/2022 at 2:30 p.m. Parties are directed to use the same teleconference number as the 7/12/2022 conference. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (Text Only Order) (kj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
41 41 misc Letter Fri 07/15 4:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Oscar Alvarado dated 07/15/2022 re: Objections to Discovery. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Alvarado, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Discovery Requests
40 40 misc Letter Fri 07/15 3:39 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Oscar Alvarado dated 07/15/2022 re: Objections to Discovery. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Alvarado, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
minutes Status Conference Wed 07/13 5:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Status Conference held on 7/12/2022. OscarAlvarado appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Michael Chong appeared on behalf of the defendants. By 7/15/2022, (1) Plaintiff is to serve responses and objections to Defendants outstanding document requests, and (2) Defendants are to produce their corporate formation documents to Plaintiff. By 7/22/2022, Plaintiff is to produce documents in response to Defendants outstanding document requests. By 7/25/2022, the parties are to file a joint letter regarding the status of discovery. Next conference set for 8/1/2022 at 3:00 pm.Parties are directed to use the same teleconference number as the 7/12/22 conference. (Court Reporter AT&T) (sbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
39 39 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/30 12:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic status conference before Magistrate Judge Krause is hereby scheduled for Tuesday, July 12, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. To access the teleconference, please follow these directions: (1) dial the meeting number: (877) 336-1831; (2) enter the access code: 2751700; and (3) press pound (#) to enter the teleconference as a guest. Should counsel experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. Telephone Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 6/30/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
38 38 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/29 10:44 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:37 Joint Status Letter, filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Discovery is extended until 7/31/22. The next case management conference will be 9/21/22 at 10 am. There will be no more extensions. So Ordered., ( Discovery due by 7/31/2022., Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/28/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
37 37 misc Letter Tue 06/28 3:49 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Michael K. Chong, Esq. dated 6/28/22 re: Joint Status Letter - which Plaintiff's counsel never filed. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/24 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of June 27, 2022, the Court will hold civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments for this matter by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/24/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 06/24 2:33 PM
ORDER On May 10, 2022, the Court ordered the parties "to submit a letter to Magistrate Judge Krause by no later than June 17, 2022 to confirm that all discovery has been completed." ECF No. 34. To date, no such letter has been filed. Accordingly, the parties are hereby granted an extension of time nunc pro tunc until June 28, 2022 to file a letter confirming that all discovery has been completed. If the parties fail to file their letter by the deadline, then the Court will deem all discovery to have been completed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (Text Only Order) (KJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
minutes Mediation Conference Fri 07/08 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 6/23/2022. Mediation Status due by 7/25/2022. (mnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 05/24 3:00 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
34 34 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/10 4:47 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:33 Letter filed by Fidel Penate. ENDORSEMENT:The parties' proposed deposition schedule is hereby ADOPTED as an order of the Court. The deadline to complete depositions is hereby extended to June 14, 2022. All other deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 19) remain in effect. The parties are directed to submit a letter to Magistrate Judge Krause by no later than June 17, 2022 to confirm that all discovery has been completed. No further conference will be scheduled with Magistrate Judge Krause at this time, though the parties must contact Magistrate Judge Krause promptly if any issues arise between today and June 14, 2022 that would prevent the timely completion of all discovery. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 6/14/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 5/10/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Letter Tue 05/10 4:17 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Oscar Alvarado dated 5/10/2022 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Alvarado, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
minutes Status Conference Fri 05/06 12:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Status Conference held on 5/6/2022. Oscar Alvarado appeared by telephone on behalf of he plaintiff. Michael Chong appeared by telephone on behalf of the defendants. By 5/10/2022, the parties must file a joint letter that (1) provides the agreed-upon schedule for depositions, and (2) updates the Court regarding the scheduling of a second mediation session. Upon receipt of the joint letter, the Court will set a date for the next conference. Adjourned. (Court Reporter AT&T) (sbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
31 31 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 04/07 1:47 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 04/07 2:27 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephone conference currently scheduled for April 29, 2022 is hereby adjourned to May 6, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause)(Text Only Order) (Krause, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
minutes Mediation Conference Fri 04/22 3:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 3/25/2022. Mediation Status due by 4/25/2022. (mnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
30 30 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/17 11:35 AM
RESCHEDULING ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 22, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Krause is hereby rescheduled to Friday, April 29, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. To access the teleconference, please follow these directions: (1) dial the meeting number: (877) 336-1831; (2) enter the access code: 2751700; and (3) press pound (#) to enter the teleconference as a guest. Should counsel experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/17/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
28 28 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/15 5:26 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/15 6:18 PM
ORDER granting28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to complete depositions is hereby extended to May 9, 2022. All other deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order (ECF No. 19) remain in effect. Also, the parties' deadline to raise any affirmative discovery disputes by letter is today, March 15, 2022, and that deadline has NOT been extended. If the parties do not have any disputes regarding paper or written discovery, then there of course is no need to submit any letters, and the March 22, 2022 conference will be adjourned until a date in late April. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause)(Text Only Order) (Krause, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 01/21 1:45 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
minutes Status Conference Thu 01/13 9:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Status Conference held on 1/12/2022. Oscar Alvarado appeared by telephone on behalf of Plaintiff. Michael Chong appeared by telephone on behalf of Defendants. Plaintiff to provide responses to outstanding document requests and interrogatories by 1/19/2022. Any party wishing to raise an affirmative discovery dispute must do so in a letter filed by 3/15/2022; responsive letters to be filed by 3/18/2022. Next conference date set for 3/22/2022 at 10:00 am, either by telephone (if there are no discovery disputes) or in person (if there are discovery disputes). If the conference is conducted by telephone, the parties are directed to call the same teleconference number as the 1/12/2022 conference. (Court Reporter AT&T) (sbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
27 27 order Protective Order Mon 12/27 3:31 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... To the extent any provisions of this Confidentiality Order are inconsistent with the Individual Practices of Judge Karas or Magistrate Judge Krause, particularly with respect to procedures for filing documents under seal or the method or timing for raising discovery disputes (see, e.g., paragraphs 7, 8, and 14), the procedures in the Court's orders governing this case and/or the judges' Individual Practices shall supersede any provisions in this document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/27/2021) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
26 26 misc Proposed Protective Order Tue 12/21 3:36 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/17 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oscar Alvarado on behalf of Fidel Penate..(Alvarado, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 12/15 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/14/2022.(ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/14 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shan Zhu on behalf of Fidel Penate..(Zhu, Shan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/07 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This matter has been referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause for general pretrial supervision. ECF No. 21. A telephonic status conference before Magistrate Judge Krause is hereby scheduled Wednesday, January 12, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. To access the teleconference, please follow these directions: (1) dial the meeting number: (877) 336-1831; (2) enter the access code: 2751700; and (3) press pound (#) to enter the teleconference as a guest. Should counsel experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/7/2021) (tg)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs order Order Tue 12/07 10:58 AM
ORDER: In order to facilitate the progress of pre-trial discovery of this litigation in a just, speedy and inexpensive manner, to ensure compliance with the case management plan, and to prevent the accumulation of unresolved discovery issues, the following procedures will be followed for the resolution of discovery disputes: The party objecting to disclosure, claiming an insufficient response to a discovery request, or asserting a privilege bears the burden of coming forward by bringing the dispute to the attention of the Court as hereinafter set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/7/2021) (tg) Modified on 12/7/2021 (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/02 11:24 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/2/2021) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
20 20 order Mediation Referral Order Tue 11/30 4:24 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: This case is determined to be eligible for mediation as to all issues regarding Defendants. The entire mediation process is confidential. The parties and the Mediator may not disclose information regarding the process, including settlement terms, to the Court or to third persons unless all parties agree. The identity of the Mediator is not to be disclosed even to the Court. However, persons authorized by the Court to administer or evaluate the mediation program may have access to information necessary to administer or evaluate the program and parties, and counsel and mediators may respond to confidential inquiries or surveys by said persons authorized by the Court to administer or evaluate the mediation program. The mediation process shall be treated as a compromise negotiation for purposes of the Federal Rules of Evidence and state rules of evidence. The Mediator is disqualified as a witness, consultant, attorney, or expert in any pending or future action relating to the dispute, including actions between persons not parties to the mediation process. Entry of this case into the Court's mediation program shall not be deemed to change any timetable set by the Court contained in a scheduling order or otherwise governing the completion of discovery, motion practice or trial date. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/10/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/30/2021) (rro)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Case Management Plan Tue 11/30 12:55 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 3/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is three (3) days. Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/30/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 12/01 11:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/30/2021. Qinyu Fan appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Michael Chong appeared on behalf of Defendants. No court reporter served. The Court adopted a case management order. See Order. The case is referred to mediation and to a magistrate judge for settlement conference. The Court will hold a status conference on June 29, 2022 at 12:00 pm. (JMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
18 18 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Wed 11/24 5:42 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Fan, Qinyu)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/24 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of November 29, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/24/2021) (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 11/15 10:04 AM
CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, November 30, 2021 at 11 :45 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 11:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/15/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Qinyu Fan on behalf of Fidel Penate..(Fan, Qinyu)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/22 12:27 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. So Ordered. (Attorney Jiajing Fan terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/22/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/21 5:01 PM
MOTION for Jiajing Fan to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Fan, Jiajing)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Attorney Declaration
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/01 7:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/26 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jian Hang on behalf of Fidel Penate..(Hang, Jian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
10 10 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/29 4:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above captioned matter is hereby extended to 30 days from the date this Stipulation is so ordered by the Court. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. Defendants reserve all defenses to this action, except waive as to service of the initial Complaint IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, this stipulation may be signed in counterparts and a facsimile or electronic signature shall be sufficient for all purposes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/29/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/28 8:36 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/25 1:21 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/25 1:16 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Celtic Services NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/25 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael K. Chong on behalf of Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc...(Chong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 06/03 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 06/03 9:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jiajing Fan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jiajing Fan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 06/03 9:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jiajing Fan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 06/03 9:24 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 06/03 9:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 06/03 9:25 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
4 4 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Fan, Jiajing)
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Celtic Services NYC Inc., White Star NYC Inc., Kieran Slevin aka Camaron, Carlos Mendoza, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Fan, Jiajing)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fan, Jiajing)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Celtic Services NYC Inc., Carlos Mendoza, Kieran Slevin, White Star NYC Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24615673)Document filed by Fidel Penate..(Fan, Jiajing)
Related: [-]