Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00337
Case Filed:May 05, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jun 04, 2021 3:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Roman Flores (1)
Represented By
Kenneth R. Bailey
Bailey Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Reza (2)
Represented By
Donna M. Grill
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Robert N. Melching
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Toledo
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/04/2021 4:21 AM EDT
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
1 1 UNSEALED INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Roman Flores (1) count(s) 1, 2, Matthew Reza (2) count(s) 1, 2. (M,L) Indictment unsealed on 5/27/2021 (R,Ke).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signature Page,
Att: 2 Designation Form
2 2 1 pgs Motion to Seal Indictment by United States of America as to Roman Flores (1), Matthew Reza (2). (M,L)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order granting Government's2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Roman Flores (1), Matthew Reza (2) Judge James R. Knepp II on 5/5/2021. (M,L)
Related: [-]