Original Case: 5:15-cv-02439

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-pcf-30304
Typeprivate civil federal / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2021
Terminated:Dec 07, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 08, 2021 2:28 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Sarah Katherine Casey
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Emily Olivier Kesler
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Kent Andrew Lambert
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Katie L. Dysart
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joanna Pruitt Lester
Represented By
Joanna Pruitt Lester
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/08/2021 2:28 AM CST
Thursday, June 03, 2021
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Joanna Pruitt Lester 21-30304 (MCS)
Related: [-]