Original Case: 1:19-cv-00048

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cvus-02008
Typecivil us
Nature of Suit304
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2021
Terminated:Nov 30, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jun 04, 2021 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
UNITED STATES
Represented By
Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELEAZAR AVALOS
Represented By
Gregory O'Duden I
National Treasury Employees Union
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES DAVIS
Represented By
Gregory O'Duden I
National Treasury Employees Union
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/11/2023 7:48 PM EST
Thursday, June 03, 2021
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received:. [778294] Entry of Appearance is due 06/17/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/17/2021. Docketing Statement is due 07/06/2021. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 08/02/2021. [LMN] [Entered: 06/03/2021 10:36 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 8 pgs Civil Case Docketed
3 3 2 pgs Official caption revised to correct party designations. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [778331] [LMN] [Entered: 06/03/2021 11:53 AM]
Related: [-]