Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Mac R Mccoy
Case #: 8:21-cv-01364
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 01, 2021 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
City of Venice
Represented By
Mark E. Levitt
Allen, Norton & Blue, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruth Terry
Mack Law Firm Chartered 2022 Placida Road
Englewood, FL 34224
Represented By
Jacqulyn Mack
The Mack Law Firm, Chartered
contact info
Kerry Ellen Mack
The Mack Law Firm, Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
41 41 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/20 2:22 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/20/2022. (MTP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
40 40 adr Mediation report Thu 09/15 5:38 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 09/15/22. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Brown, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/01 12:02 PM
NOTICE by City of Venice Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Address of Counsel (Sugerman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
38 38 adr Notice of selection of mediator Mon 07/25 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Deborah C. Brown, Esq. as mediator by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
37 37 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 07/11 1:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ruth Terry. Related case(s): Yes (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/01 1:05 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:21-cv-1364-MSS-MRM. Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite no longer assigned to the case. (KE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
35 35 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Wed 05/25 12:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/12/2023. Jury Trial set for the AUGUST 2023 TRIAL TERM, which commences July 31, 2022, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/19/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/25/2022. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
34 34 misc Case Management Report Wed 05/18 3:16 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/11 6:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 03/03 12:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 11, 2022, to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Compliant. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/3/2022. (MTP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 03/02 4:55 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 02/17 1:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 29 Plaintiff's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 1, 2022, to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Compliant. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/17/2022. (MTP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 02/16 4:42 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
28 28 motion Dismiss Tue 01/25 9:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by City of Venice.(Sugerman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 01/18 9:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 26 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 25, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/18/2022. (MWC)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 01/18 9:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Amended Complaint by City of Venice. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/03 10:56 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 24 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 18, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/3/2022. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 12/29 2:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Amended Complaint by City of Venice. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 12/29 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Mark E. Levitt on behalf of City of Venice. Lead Counsel: Mark E. Levitt. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/28 10:43 AM
NOTICE to counsel Marc A. Sugerman and Mark E. Levitt of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of appearance Mon 12/27 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Aaron Sugerman on behalf of City of Venice (Sugerman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/20 8:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First against City of Venice with Jury Demand. filed by Ruth Terry. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Ruth Terry.(Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 12/14 10:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 18 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 20, 2021 to file her Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/14/2021. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 12/13 4:32 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 11/30 10:03 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 13, 2021 to file her Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/30/2021. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 11/29 2:43 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re1 Complaint by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/09 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule,13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/09 1:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING AS STATED HEREIN 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/9/2021. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/26 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by City of Venice. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
12 12 14 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition Thu 09/09 5:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in opposition re9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 09/07 9:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 9, 2021 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/7/2021. (MWC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 09/03 5:46 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
9 9 motion Dismiss Thu 08/19 8:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Venice. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/03 5:04 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have up to and including August 17, 2021 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/3/2021. (MWC)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/03 3:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by City of Venice. (Levitt, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
6 6 service Summons returned executed Tue 07/27 12:34 PM
RETURN of service executed on 7/13/2021 by Ruth Terry as to City of Venice. (LD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 06/14 11:26 AM
NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 06/10 12:40 PM
SUMMONS issued as to City of Venice. (LD)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Proposed summons Thu 06/10 9:53 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Ruth Terry. (Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/07 8:28 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-1364-MSS-CPT. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
1 1 88 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/04 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Ruth Terry with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18330891) filed by Ruth Terry.(Mack, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons