Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Janet T Neff
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:21-cv-00459
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2021
Terminated:Nov 19, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 01, 2021 3:42 AM EST
defendant
Central Coast Designs, Inc.
a Michigan for-profit corporation, 313 Maumee Street
Jonesville, MI 49250
Represented By
Bradley L. Smith
Endurance Law Group
contact info
defendant
Precision Metal Art USA, LLC
a Michigan limited liablity company, 10220 Waldron Road
Jerome, MI 49249
Represented By
Bradley L. Smith
Endurance Law Group
contact info
defendant
Alan L Russell
an individual, 245 W. Mechanic Rd
Hillsdale, MI 49242
Represented By
Bradley L. Smith
Endurance Law Group
contact info
plaintiff
Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC
a Nebraska limited liability company, 522 S. Elm Ave
Hastings, NE 68901
Represented By
Thomas Paul Heed
Heed Law Group PLLC
contact info
plaintiff
Brian LaRoche
an individual, 522 S. Elm Ave.
Hastings, NE 68901
Represented By
Thomas Paul Heed
Heed Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 22, 2021
18 18 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright Mon 11/22 10:25 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 11/22 10:27 AM
Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright18 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 11/19 11:15 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION to dismiss16 ; the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, interest or attorneys' fees; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/19 10:42 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by plaintiffs Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC, Brian LaRoche (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/01 4:24 PM
ORDER granting stipulated proposed order14 ; dismissal papers to be filed no later than 11/19/2021; if the parties fail to reach a final settlement, Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading due not later than 12/3/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
14 14 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 10/29 4:32 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time by plaintiffs Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC, Brian LaRoche (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Wed 10/06 11:23 AM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 11/5/2021; if the parties fail to reach a final settlement, Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading due not later than 11/19/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 09/01 3:46 PM
ORDER granting stipulated proposed order11 ; Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond by 9/30/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 09/01 10:05 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER extending time within which Defendants have to Answer or otherwise respond to complaint to Sept. 30, 2021 by plaintiffs Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC, Brian LaRoche (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/01 10:03 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Precision Metal Art USA, LLC served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021 (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/01 10:02 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Alan L Russell served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021 (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/01 10:01 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Central Coast Designs, Inc. served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021 (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 08/27 12:19 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley L. Smith on behalf of defendants Central Coast Designs, Inc., Precision Metal Art USA, LLC, Alan L Russell Endurance Law Group PLC (Smith, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
7 7 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Fri 08/06 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs to timely complete service of process or file a verified petition RE: Service of Process by 9/2/2021, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 06/10 9:23 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Central Coast Designs, Inc., Precision Metal Art USA, LLC, Alan L Russell (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/08 8:54 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 06/08 8:52 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
3 3 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright Mon 06/07 11:05 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment complaint
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 06/07 10:58 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 06/07 11:09 AM
Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright3 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (mg)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Mon 06/07 11:10 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Central Coast Designs, Inc., Precision Metal Art USA, LLC, Alan L Russell (none provided) (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/04 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC, Brian LaRoche (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 06/04 3:46 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Big Rig T-Shirt & Decals LLC, Brian LaRoche in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6454016 (Heed, Thomas)
Related: [-]