Aqua Pennsylvania Inc v. AGC Chemicals Americas Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01667 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:21-cv-02126 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 01, 2021 4:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AQUA PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/04 5:08 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:21-cv-02126, Aqua Pennsylvania Inc v. AGC Chemicals Americas Inc et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1667-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02126. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY3 TO COUNSEL ON 5/24/21. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/4/2021.] | ||
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 3M COMPANY, AQUA PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CHEMGUARD INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/4/2021.] |