Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:21-cr-01115
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 05, 2021 2:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Andres Morales (1)
Represented By
Ricardo Montalvo
Atty At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Roberto Lopez, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/05/2021 3:20 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
Arrest of Andres Morales, filed. (YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Andres Morales (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 5/12/2021 at 09:05 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Andres Morales, filed.(YeseniaIbarra, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Roberto Lopez, Jr appearing for USA, filed.(Lopez, Roberto) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Andres Morales held on 5/12/2021. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant agreed to having the hearing by video conference. Defendant informed of legal rights. Defendant appeared with retained counsel. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and the factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Government moved for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court granted. Preliminary and Detention Hearings set for 5/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Roberto Lopez, AUSA; Ricardo Montalvo f/Defendant. (USPO: Marina Garza) (ERO: Omar Orta) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis/not used) (DUSM: Zeth Whitten). (dfloresadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ricardo Montalvo appearing for Andres Morales , filed.(Montalvo, Ricardo) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Andres Morales. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (dfloresadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Andres Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (dfloresadi, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Andres Morales, filed. [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Andres Morales: Bond Hearing set for 5/14/2021 at 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. (dflores, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Andres Morales held on 05/13/2021. Defendant agreed to having the hearings by video conference. Defendant, through counsel, waived the Preliminary Examination; the Court found probable cause. Regarding the issue of bond, the Court heard arguments from the attorneys. The Government was not opposed to a bond but requested a higher cash deposit. The Court took judicial notice of Pretrial Report (Dkt. No. 7) and entered findings. The Court set a $75,000.00 bond with a $3,500.00 cash deposit. The Court further adopted conditions of release (Conditions 2 through 13) that are set out in the Pretrial Report (Dkt. No. 7 at 6). Defendant remanded to the custody of U.S. Marshals Service, until Defendant can be released on bond. Appearances: Robert Lopez, Jr., AUSA; Ricardo Montalvo, Retained Attorney. (ERO: Kathryn Nelson)(Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Nathan Rhodes/not used)(USPO: Orlando Montemayor) (DUSM: Tommy Ayala), filed. (jhacker) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Andres Morales. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (dsolis, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
Bond payment received for Andres Morales. Payment submitted by IRMA LINDA TIJERINA in the amount of $3,500.00. Receipt number # MCA023854, filed. (lcorbett, 7) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker: BOND RELEASE HEARING as to Andres Morales held on 05/14/2021. Defendant agreed to having the hearing by video conference. The Court explained the terms and conditions of release pertaining to Defendants bond. Defendant stated that he understood his conditions of release and authorized his attorney, Mr. Montalvo, to sign the bond paperwork on his behalf. Defendant remanded to the custody of U.S. Marshals Service. Defendant will be released directly from the detention facility once the paperwork is processed. Appearances: Lee Fry, AUSA; Ricardo Montalvo, Retained Attorney. (ERO: Jennifer Nogueira)(Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Nathan Rhodes/not used)(USPO: Daisy Montemayor) (DUSM: Chris Sanchez), filed. (jhacker) [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to Andres Morales in amount of $ 75,000 with a $3,500 deposit, Receipt # MCA023854. Bond Depositor: IRMA LINDA TIJERINA, filed.(YeseniaIbarra, 7) Modified on 5/19/2021 (dflores, 7). [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Andres Morales. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (YeseniaIbarra, 7) Modified on 5/19/2021 (dflores, 7). [7:21-mj-01012]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
10 10 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Andres Morales (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, filed. (SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
11 11 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Andres Morales, filed.(SandraSilva, 7)
Related: [-]