Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-02018
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 05, 2021 12:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Jose Navarro Gomez (1)
Represented By
Alex B Hernandez, III
Federal Defenders - Yak
contact info
Federal Public Defender - YAK
Federal Defenders - Yak
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard Cassidy Burson
U S Attorney'S Office - Yak
contact info
Matthew Alan Stone
U S Attorney'S Office - Yak
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2022
JUDGMENT as to Jose Navarro Gomez; Count 1 - Imprisonment: 63 months; Supervised Release: 5 years; Special Penalty Assessment: $100; Fine Waived. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (SG, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 06/05/2021 1:42 AM PDT
Thursday, May 27, 2021
Arrest of Jose Navarro Gomez (1) on 5/27/2021. (CLP, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jose N. Gomez (1). (PH, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
2 2 Charges and Penalties as to Jose N. Gomez (1). (PH, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jose N. Gomez (1). (Burson, Richard) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court (USM Action Required) as to Jose N. Gomez (1). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 5/28/2021 at 10:45 AM in Yakima Courtroom 102 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from Yakima County Jail. Due to the Courts General Order 2021-5 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. General Order 20-101-3, 20-101-3 Extended, and the CARES Act, Pub. L. No. 116-136. (PH, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Jose N. Gomez (1). IT IS ORDERED the Federal Defenders of Eastern Washington are provisionally appointed to represent Defendant pending approval of his affidavit pursuant to Title 18 United States Code Sec. 3006A Appointed Federal Public Defender - YAK for Jose N. Gomez - Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (NM, Law Clerk) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Jose N. Gomez (1) held on 5/28/2021. Related [+] (PH, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/Y-102. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
9 9 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Jose N. Gomez (1) (Webster, Craig) Modified on 6/1/2021 - [not signed by defendant] Attorney to re-file using Amended/Corrected document. (AY, Case Administrator).[1:21-mj-04065-MKD] Modified on 6/3/2021: Strike out docket text as document will not be re-filed. (LTR, Case Administrator).
Related: [-]
10 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS by Jose N. Gomez (1) (Webster, Craig) Modified on 6/1/2021 [not signed by defendant] Attorney to re-file using Amended/Corrected document. (AY, Case Administrator).[1:21-mj-04065-MKD] Modified on 6/3/2021: Strike out docket text as document will not be re-filed. (LTR, Case Administrator).
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT AND SETTING DETENTION HEARING (USM Action Required) as to Jose N. Gomez (1). Detention Hearing set for 6/1/2021 at 2:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference; Preliminary Hearing set for 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CLP, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Matthew Alan Stone appearing for USA as to Jose N. Gomez (1) (Attorney Matthew Alan Stone added to party USA(pty:pla))(Stone, Matthew) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Detention Hearing as to Jose N Gomez held on 6/1/2021. Related [+] (SG, Case Administrator) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/R-326. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alex B Hernandez, III appearing for Jose N Gomez (1) (Attorney Alex B Hernandez, III added to party Jose N Gomez(pty:dft))(Hernandez, Alex) [1:21-mj-04065-MKD]
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT as to Jose Navarro Gomez (1) - Count 1. (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
18 18 Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Jose Navarro Gomez (1). (LTR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]