Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:21-mj-06299
Case Filed:May 06, 2021
Terminated:May 20, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jul 08, 2021 10:20 PM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael N. Berger
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (1)
Terminated: 05/20/2021
Represented By
David Scott Markus
Law Offices Of David Markus
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2021 3:33 PM EDT
Thursday, May 06, 2021
Arrest of Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (at)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (1). (tpl)
Related: [-]