Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00071
Case Filed:May 07, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 06, 2021 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Jeffrey Christopher Anders (1)
Represented By
Paul H. Rosenberg
Attorney Of Law, Paul Rosenberg
contact info
Melanie S. Keiper
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Mackenzi Jo Nash
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amy L. Jennings
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/06/2021 2:42 AM CDT
Thursday, April 15, 2021
Judge update in case as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. (pll) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (pll) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT by USA, signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders (1). (pll) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. Initial Appearance set for 4/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South via Video Proceeding with Polk County Jail before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/15/2021. (pll) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Initial Appearance as to Defendant Jeffrey Christopher Anders held on 4/16/2021. Attorney Melanie S. Keiper for defendant. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/2021 at 04:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Defendant shall appear via video conference from the Polk County Jail. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/16/2021. (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 5 ORDER as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/16/2021. (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING A DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/22/2021 at 04:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South - Video Proceeding before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Defendant shall appear via video conference from the Polk County Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/16/2021. (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
9 9 Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed on 04/15/2021 in case as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (mrc) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FPD Mackenzi Jo Nash appearing for Jeffrey Christopher Anders (Nash, Mackenzi) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
11 11 Bail/Bond Report (Sealed) as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (Davidson, Priscilla) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Preliminary Hearing as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders held on 4/22/2021. The Court found that probable cause exists that the defendant committed the offense(s) charged in the Complaint. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (kmp/mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer: Detention Hearing as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders held on 4/22/2021. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (kmp/mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL and granting 7 Motion for Detention as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/22/2021. (mel) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
15 15 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (kmp) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Counsel Paul H. Rosenberg appearing for Jeffrey Christopher Anders (Rosenberg, Paul) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders. (Nash, Mackenzi) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]
18 18 TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mackenzi Jo Nash withdrawn from case as to Jeffrey Christopher Anders (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2021. (mlr) [4:21-mj-00252-CFB]
Related: [-]