Member Case
Lead case is: 4:21-bk-31861

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:21-bk-31891
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Valpico Glenbriar Apartments LLC
9305 E Via de Ventura
Scottsdale, AZ 85258-3597
Represented By
Cameron A. Secord
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/16 6:05 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Lopez . (RobbieWestmoreland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/11 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/09 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
5 5 court No Creditor Mailing List Tue 06/08 12:19 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Order for Prosecution (Chapter 7) Tue 06/08 12:19 PM
Initial Order for Prosecution Signed on 6/8/2021 (JosephWellsadi)
Related: [-]
order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Tue 06/08 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 06/08 4:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-31891 [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23080355. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
2 2 order Joint Administration Mon 06/07 9:59 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 21-31861 Signed on 6/7/2021 (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 06/07 10:00 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-31861 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned/Previous Judge Mon 06/07 10:00 AM
Judge David R Jones is added to the case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur is terminated. (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 06, 2021
1 1 38 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sun 06/06 11:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Valpico Glenbriar Apartments LLC. (Secord, Cameron)
Related: [-]