New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:21-cv-12201
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2021
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 04, 2021 4:32 AM EST
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY
Defendant
ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Defendant
TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Represented By
THOMAS GENE MCINTOSH
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
In Re
ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
EDITH JONES
Represented By
PAUL J. PENNOCK
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
mdl MDL Closed Thu 03/13 10:21 AM
Member Case Closed on 3/12/2025 for MDL 2973. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 03/12 11:29 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/12/2025. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 03/11 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by EDITH JONES. (SEDGH, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 13, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 04/13 2:56 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (and, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
12 12 misc Substitution of Attorney Mon 04/04 3:18 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS GENE MCINTOSH terminated. Attorney MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. added.. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/07 12:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDITH JONES. JANSSEN ORTHO LLC served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/03 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/31 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS GENE MCINTOSH on behalf of TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (MCINTOSH, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/08 3:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gh, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Tue 06/08 3:41 PM
This case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:Here] (gh, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Tue 06/08 3:42 PM
Member Case Direct File on 6/7/21 for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/07 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12524908) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDITH JONES.(PENNOCK, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Designation of Forum,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/08 8:19 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (gh, )
Related: [-]