Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:21-cv-61179
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 04, 2021 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Para Longevity 2019-5, LLC
Defendant
Centurion ISG Finance Group, LLC
Defendant
Centurion ISG Holdings II, LLC
Defendant
Centurion ISG Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Centurion ISG Services, LLC
Defendant
Centurion Insurance Services Group, LLC
Defendant
Integrity Assets 2016, LLC
Defendant
Para Longevity 2015-3, LLC
Defendant
Para Longevity 2015-5, LLC
5 Concourse Parkway Ste. 3000
Atlanta, GA 30328
Defendant
Para Longevity 2019-3, LLC
Defendant
Centurion ISG (Europe) Limited
Defendant
Para Longevity 2019-6, LLC
Defendant
SH Global, LLC
Defendant
SHPC Holdings I, LLC
Defendant
Brian J. Schwartz
Defendant
Seeman Holtz Property and Casualty, LLC
Defendant
Seeman-Holtz Consulting Corp..
Defendant
The Estate of Eric Charles Holtz
Defendant
Valentino Global Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Para Longevity 2018-3, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Emerald Assets 2018, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Emerald Assets Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Eric Holtz
Defendant
Integrity Assets, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
National Senior Insurance, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Para Longevity 2014-5, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Para Longevity 2016-3, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Para Longevity 2016-5, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Centurion Funding SPV II, LLC
Defendant
Para Longevity 2018-5, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Para Longevity Holdings VI, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Para Para Longevity 2015-5, LLC
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Marshall Seeman
Represented By
Scott Alan Orth
Law Office Of Scott Alan Orth P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Altrai Global, LLC
Defendant
Ameritonian Enterprises, LLC
Defendant
Centurion Funding SPV I, LLC
Mediator
Howard Tescher
Tescher Mediation Group, Inc 401 E. Las Olas Blvd Suite 1400
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
Fanny B Millstein
Represented By
Peter Mathis Spett
Law Office Of Peter M. Spett
contact info
Brett Elliott von Borke
Buckner And Miles, P.A.
contact info
Scott Lance Silver
Silver Law Group
contact info
Michael S Hill
Menzer & Hill, P.A.
contact info
Gary Steven Menzer
Menzer & Hill, P.A.
contact info
Ryan Adam Schwamm
Silver Law Group
contact info
Joshua Arnold Katz
Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC
contact info
James D. Sallah
Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC
contact info
David Buckner
Buckner+miles
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2022
ORDER denying 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 75 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (jb03)
GPO Sep 02 2022
ORDER denying 80 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (jb03)
GPO Dec 30 2022
Order on the Class's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and the Class's Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (lgr)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, January 13, 2023
136 136 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/13 4:39 PM
Order Dismissing Certain Defendants Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
Related: [-]