Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:21-cv-02330
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2021
Terminated:Aug 30, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 04, 2021 5:08 AM EST
Defendant
Bo Ford
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Fisher Kinsinger
Thompson, Sweeny, Kinsinger & Pereira, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gwinnett County School District
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Fisher Kinsinger
Thompson, Sweeny, Kinsinger & Pereira, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
J. Alvin Wilbanks
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Fisher Kinsinger
Thompson, Sweeny, Kinsinger & Pereira, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeff Corkill
Represented By
Craig Lewis Goodmark
Goodmark Law Firm
contact info
Gerald R. Weber
Gerald R Weber
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/13 12:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jeff Corkill. (Goodmark, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/30 11:36 AM
ORDER directing Clerk to Administratively Close this case based on settlement. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/30/2021. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 08/30 11:38 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/16 4:58 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by J. Alvin Wilbanks. (Kinsinger, Elizabeth Ann)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/16 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Bo Ford, Gwinnett County School District. Discovery ends on 1/13/2022.(Kinsinger, Elizabeth Ann)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 06/08 10:54 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 06/08/2021. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 06/07 5:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Gwinnett County School District. (rvb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/07 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jeff Corkill. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11022941)(rvb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet