In Re: Paraquat Products Liability Litigation v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy J Rosenstengel |
Case #: | 3:21-md-03004 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 29, 2021 8:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Chevron Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Phillips Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-60
|
|
Defendant
Phillips 66
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillips 66 Company, DE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Syngenta AG
|
|
Defendant
Syngenta Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
|
|
Defendant
Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Syngenta Seeds, LLC
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Carl Adams
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Robin Adams
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Albanese
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Theresa Albanese
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Nazerano Amatucci
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Terry Atha
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Donald Ayres
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Warren Bakken
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Ben Barr
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
John Barrat
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Beshear
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Karen Beshear
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Betz, MO
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Nancy Betz, MO
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Robert Bishop
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Greg Boldt
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Roy Bonnett
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Velma Brown
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Mesa Brown Jefferson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Marvin Cates
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Dessa Copas
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Stanley Copas
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Brenda Crane
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
James Crane
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Edward Crawford
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Janet Crawford
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Russell Denes
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Deno
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Barbara Diamond
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Alison Lee Dietrich
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Wilber Dove
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Stephen Durbin
|
Represented By
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Edwin Edwards
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Billy Elmore
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Don Firmin
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Emile Folse
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Frank
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Luiba Friday
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Friday
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Audie Gaddis
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Anthony Galasso
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Noreen Galasso
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Gamwell
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Terry Gieseke
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Glassburn
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Gerald Gray
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
MaryJean Hancock
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Roger Hansrote
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Raymond Haresnape
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Diane Hawkins
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
J. Patrick Hays
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Edward Heath
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
James Hemker
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Judith Hemker
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Kay Henderson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Robert Henderson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Hensgens
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Darian Hill
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michelle Hill
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Shawn Hill
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
John Hiller
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Charles Holburn
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Doug Holliday
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Hamp Holmes, Jr
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Judy Holmes
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
James Holmquest
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Randall Holyfield
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Tara Holyfield
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Darren Ingram
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Deidre Jarvis
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Mark Jensen
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Crystal Johnston
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Cindy Kay Joiner
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Felder Joiner
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David W Jones
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Jean Rae Kearns
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Joseph Kearns
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Gayle King
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
James King
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Kirk
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Monica Kose
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Benjamin Landis
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Layne Larsen
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Gary Lehman
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Majors
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Larry Marsh
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Charles Matheny
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Linda Matheny
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Kerry McCarty
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Matthew McDonald
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
William McDonald
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Roger Dale McNeill
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Wanda McNeill
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Lawrence Mettetal
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Terry Miller
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
John Milling
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Suzanna Milling
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Jodie Moen
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Phillip Morrow
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Joe Nelson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Edward Nichols
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Thomas Keith Normand
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
John R. Nunnery, Jr.
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Carolyn O'Connor
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Timothy O'Connor
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
James Otten
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Monique Passino
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Passino
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Joan Pilgreen
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Barbara Piper
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Priewe
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
RALPH EDWARD ROUW
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Paul Rakoczy
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Robert Richmond
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Frederick L Richter
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Karen Richter
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Timothy Roys
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Terry Runyon
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Ann F. Ruscoe
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Jonathan Rutherford
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Joseph Rysavy
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Mickey Self
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Harriot Shrader
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Bonnie Smith
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Brenda Smith
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Dale Smith
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Kenneth Luckie Smith
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Charles M. Strickland
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Brian Supenia
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Denver Sweeten
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Lucinda Sweeten
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Carol Tackel
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
David Tackel
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Todd Tenneson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
J.W. Thomas
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Kimberly Jane Thompson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Zigmond Tognietti
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Mary Trower
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Kenneth Turner
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Linda Vacchino
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Scott Cramer Van Pelt
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Robert Dean Walkington
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Vickie Elaine Walkington
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Roy Ward
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Linda Waters
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Michael Waters
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Ralph Gordon Wells, Jr.
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Charles Werking
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Harold West
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Wannapha Wihoknas
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Joe Wilson
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Bonnie Wimpee
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Dewey Gerald Wimpee
|
|
MDL Plaintiff (COURT USE ONLY)
Dixie Wurster
|
|
Plaintiff
In Re: Paraquat Products Liability Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5246 | 5246
misc
MDL - Member Case
Fri 04/26 4:19 PM
MEMBER CASE(S) OPENED: original court file received from ILSD: 24-PQ-1174-NJR (Mayberry v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1177-NJR (Fousek v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1180-NJR (Bruders v. Syngenta AG et al). (clw) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5245 | 5245
misc
MDL - Member Case
Wed 04/24 3:51 PM
MEMBER CASE(S) OPENED: original court file received from ILSD: 24-PQ-1161-NJR (Schwarz v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1162-NJR (Thompson v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1164-NJR (Monroe v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1166-NJR (Kidd v. Syngenta AG et al). (clw) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5244 | 5244
misc
MDL - Member Case
Tue 04/23 3:34 PM
MEMBER CASE(S) OPENED: original court file received from ILSD: 24-PQ-1155-NJR (Edwards v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1156-NJR (Crawford v. Syngenta AG et al). (clw) |
|
5243 | 5243
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 3:09 PM
NOTICE that the following member cases have been closed: 23-PQ-4046-NJR (Wenzel), 24-PQ-879-NJR (Glover). (clw) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5242 | 5242
misc
MDL - Member Case
Mon 04/22 4:12 PM
MEMBER CASE(S) OPENED: original court file received from ILSD: 24-PQ-1148-NJR (Riccio v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1150-NJR (Schwenk v. Syngenta AG et al). (clw) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5241 | 5241
misc
MDL - Member Case
Fri 04/19 4:05 PM
MEMBER CASE(S) OPENED: original court file received from ILSD: 24-PQ-1141-NJR (Radatz v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1143-NJR (Edwards v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1144-NJR (Riffe v. Syngenta AG et al), 24-PQ-1146-NJR (Williams v. Syngenta AG et al). (clw) |