New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:21-mc-00475
CauseM 18-302 Registration of Foreign Judgment
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2021
Terminated:Jun 08, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/14 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Evan Mazur on behalf of SLFAQ, LLC..(Mazur, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 6:20 PM
NOTICE of Assignment of Judgment to SLFAQ LLC re:2 Registration of Foreign Judgment,. Document filed by SLFAQ, LLC..(Mazur, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Sell Judgments,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Sale of Judgments
Monday, June 14, 2021
3 3 misc Proposed Abstract of Judgment Mon 06/14 11:15 AM
PROPOSED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Filing fee $ 11.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24668371. Abstract of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Burton W. Wiand. Document Number of Related Judgment:2 ..(Perez, Jared) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
misc Abstract of Judgment Issued Mon 06/14 11:22 AM
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED on June 14, 2021, in favor of Burton W. Wiand against Kevin Kerrigan Management, Inc. in the amount of $320,889.70. Abstract of Judgment mailed by the Court.(km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
2 2 misccs Registration of Foreign Judgment Tue 06/08 11:15 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT Judgment in favor of Burton W. Wiand against Kevin Kerrigan Management, Inc. in the amount of $ 320,889.70. Other Court Name: United States District Court - Middle District of Florida. Other Court Case Number: 8:20-cv-862. (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24643769)Document filed by Burton W. Wiand.(Perez, Jared)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Tue 06/08 11:07 AM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Perez, Jared)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 06/08 11:25 AM
Case Designated ECF. (wb)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 06/08 11:26 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(wb)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Request an Abstract of Judgment Tue 06/08 11:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO REQUEST AN ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT. Notice to Attorney Jared Joseph Perez regarding 2 Registration of Foreign Judgment,. A REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT has been received by the Court. No further action is required by the Clerk's office at this time. Please see ECF Filing Rules & Instructions 16.6 on how to request an Abstract of Judgment. (wb)
Related: [-]