Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Henry W Van Eck
Case #: 1:21-bk-01299
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Jul 07, 2021
Terminated:Dec 14, 2022

Debtor
Northeast Foundation and Concrete, Inc.
189 Old York Road
New Cumberland, PA 17070
Represented By
Paul Donald Murphy-Ahles
Dethlefs Pykosh & Murphy
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Trustee
Steven M. Carr (Trustee)
Ream Carr Markey Woloshin & Hunter LLP 119 East Market Street
York, PA 17401


Docket last updated: 06/11/2021 1:45 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Wed 06/09 9:11 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:21-bk-01299] ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A10027876, amount $ 338.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 06/09 9:10 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 338.00 Filed by Paul Donald Murphy-Ahles of Dethlefs Pykosh & Murphy on behalf of Northeast Foundation and Concrete, Inc.. (Murphy-Ahles, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed) Wed 06/09 9:10 AM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Paul Donald Murphy-Ahles of Dethlefs Pykosh & Murphy on behalf of Northeast Foundation and Concrete, Inc. Related [+]. (Murphy-Ahles, Paul)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 court Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 06/09 10:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Carr (Trustee), Steven M. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/7/2021 at 01:30 PM - (York) The 341 meeting will be conducted by telephone. Refer to the call-in instructions. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]