Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00083
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 09, 2021 9:29 PM HST
Defendant
Tyrell K. Silva (1)
Represented By
Rustam Barbee
Law Office Of Rustam A. Barbee
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margaret C. Nammar
U.S. Attorney'S Office, District Of Hawaii
contact info
Wayne A. Myers
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/09/2021 10:08 PM HST
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
1 1 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Tyrell K. Silva (1) count(s) 1. (emt, )
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs NOTICE OF RELATED CASE - by USA as to Tyrell K. Silva. Related to proceedings in USA v. Kapoi, et al. , CR No. 20-00099 JAO. (emt, )
Related: [-]
4 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Criminal Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
Related: [-]
5 5 EO: as to Tyrell K. Silva, Initial Appearance, Waiver of Indictment, Arraignment & Plea of Guilty to the Felony Information is SET for 6/15/2021 at 2:00 PM before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. The parties should consult the Court's digital calendar on the hearing date for the courtroom assignment. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
Related: [-]