Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00256
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jun 10, 2021 3:42 AM EDT
Defendant
JAMIEL GREEN (1)
Represented By
Thomas Livingston
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
TYRIEKE HAMMONDS (2)
Represented By
Ryan R. Smith
Ryan R. Smith Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
HAZEON KIDD (3)
Represented By
Stephen H. Begler
contact info
Defendant
DEONTE REDDICK (4)
Represented By
James J. Brink
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brendan T. Conway
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 11 2023
ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. The government's Motion in limine (Doc. 217) is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion in Limine (Doc. 218), re the firearms purchase forms, the approximately $10,000.00 in cash and the presence of fentanyl in Defendant's vehicle is GRANTED, subject to Defendant's stipulation to his possession of a firearm. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED re the oxycodone pills. Defendant's Motion is DENIED as to the still shots from videos, and pictures, depicting him smoking marijuana in a period shortly before his arrest. See U.S. v. Banks, 43 F.4th 912 (8th Cir. 2022). The denial is without prejudice to objections at trial regarding authentication, although the Banks decision's reasoning proves informative on those points as well. SEE CONTENTS OF THE PAPER ORDER CORRESPONDING WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS AND ANALYSES. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/11/23. (dcd)

Docket last updated: 06/10/2021 3:58 AM EDT
Friday, May 14, 2021
Judge update in case as to Jamiel Green, Tyrieke Hammonds, Hazeon Kidd, Deonte Reddick. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge presiding. (cww) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Jamiel Green, Tyrieke Hammonds, Hazeon Kidd, Deonte Reddick (mqe) Sealed in error by filer. [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 COMPLAINT (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 COMPLAINT (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 COMPLAINT (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
5 5 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jamiel Green. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
6 6 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Tyrieke Hammonds. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
7 7 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Hazeon Kidd. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
8 8 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Deonte Reddick. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CRIMINAL COMPLAINTS filed by USA as to Jamiel Green, Tyrieke Hammonds, Hazeon Kidd, Deonte Reddick. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Jamiel Green, Tyrieke Hammonds, Hazeon Kidd, and Deonte Reddick: Initial Appearances set for 5/14/2021 at 03:00 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
11 11 Government's Request for Detention as to Jamiel Green (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
12 12 Government's Request for Detention as to Tyrieke Hammonds (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
13 13 Government's Request for Detention as to Hazeon Kidd (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
14 14 Government's Request for Detention as to Deonte Reddick (Conway, Brendan) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Jamiel Green. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
16 16 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to Jamiel Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Initial Appearance as to Jamiel Green held on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Jamiel Green. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Detention Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 03:15 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Preliminary Examination set for 5/18/2021 03:15 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
19 19 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Tyrieke Hammonds. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
20 20 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to Tyrieke Hammonds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Initial Appearance as to Tyrieke Hammonds held on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
22 22 CJA 20 ORDER Appointing Counsel as to Tyrieke Hammonds: Appointment of Attorney Ryan R. Smith for Tyrieke Hammonds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Tyrieke Hammonds. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Detention Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Preliminary Examination set for 5/20/2021 01:30 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
24 24 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Hazeon Kidd. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
25 25 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to Hazeon Kidd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
26 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Initial Appearance as to Hazeon Kidd held on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
27 27 CJA 20 ORDER Appointing Counsel as to Hazeon Kidd: Appointment of Attorney Stephen H. Begler for Hazeon Kidd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Hazeon Kidd. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Detention Hearing set for 5/19/2021 at 02:30 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Preliminary Examination set for 5/19/2021 at 02:30 PM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
29 29 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Deonte Reddick. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
30 30 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to Deonte Reddick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Initial Appearance as to Deonte Reddick held on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
32 32 CJA 20 ORDER Appointing Counsel as to Deonte Reddick: Appointment of Attorney James J. Brink for Deonte Reddick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to Deonte Reddick. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Detention Hearing set for 5/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Preliminary Examination set for 5/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Video Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/14/2021. (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
34 34 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Hazeon Kidd (mqe) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Detention Hearing as to Jamiel Green waived on 5/18/2021. Interpreter: none (Court Reporter: Amanda Williamson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
35 35 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jamiel Green. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
36 36 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Jamiel Green. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Detention Hearing as to Hazeon Kidd held on 5/19/2021. Defendant released on agreed upon Appearance bond with additional conditions. Interpreter: none (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
37 37 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Hazeon Kidd in amount of $25,000.00. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
38 38 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to HAZEON KIDD. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/19/2021. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
44 44 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Hazeon Kidd. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Detention Hearing as to Deonte Reddick WAIVED on 5/20/2021. Interpreter: none (Court Reporter: Amanda Williamson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Detention Hearing as to Tyrieke Hammonds held on 5/20/2021; Defendant released on agreed upon conditions. Interpreter: none (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
39 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Preliminary Hearing as to Deonte Reddick held on 5/20/2021. Interpreter: none (Court Reporter: Amanda Williamson) (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
40 40 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Deonte Reddick. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
41 41 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to Deonte Reddick. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/20/2021. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
42 42 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jamiel Green. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jamiel Green; Appointed attorney Thomas Livingston for Jamiel Green. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/20/2021. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
45 45 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Tyrieke Hammonds. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
46 46 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Tyrieke Hammonds in amount of $25,000.00. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
47 47 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to TYRIEKE HAMMONDS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/20/2021. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
48 48 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Deonte Reddick. (cmc) [2:21-mj-01021-PLD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
49 49 INDICTMENT as to JAMIEL GREEN (1) count 1, TYRIEKE HAMMONDS (2) count 2, HAZEON KIDD (3) counts 3, 4, DEONTE REDDICK (4) count 5. (lar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Arraignment Plea Jamiel Green,
Att: 2 Arraignment Plea Tyrieke Hammonds,
Att: 3 Arraignment Plea Hazeon Kidd,
Att: 4 Arraignment Plea Deonte Reddick,
Att: 5 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions Jamiel Green,
Att: 6 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions Tyrieke Hammonds,
Att: 7 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions Hazeon Kidd,
Att: 8 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions Deonte Reddick,
Att: 9 Criminal Case Info Sheet Jamiel Green,
Att: 10 Criminal Case Info Sheet Tyrieke Hammonds,
Att: 11 Criminal Case Info Sheet Hazeon Kidd,
Att: 12 Criminal Case Info Sheet Deonte Reddick
50 50 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to JAMIEL GREEN, TYRIEKE HAMMONDS, HAZEON KIDD, DEONTE REDDICK (lar)
Related: [-]
51 51 NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *JAMIEL GREEN*. Arraignment set for 6/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (lar)
Related: [-]
52 52 NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *TYRIEKE HAMMONDS*. Arraignment set for 6/16/2021 at 11:30 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (lar)
Related: [-]
53 53 NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *HAZEON KIDD*. Arraignment set for 6/16/2021 at 11:30 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (lar)
Related: [-]
54 54 NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT as to *DEONTE REDDICK*. Arraignment set for 6/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (lar)
Related: [-]