Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 5:21-cv-01168
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2021
Terminated:May 20, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 07, 2021 4:22 AM EST
Defendant
Cody Butzer
Represented By
John N. Childs
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Adam D. Fuller
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Defendant
Hercules Tree Services LLC
Represented By
John N. Childs
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Adam D. Fuller
Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivan Ray
Represented By
Hans A. Nilges
Nilges Draher
contact info
Jeffrey J. Moyle
Nilges Draher - Cleveland
contact info
Shannon M. Draher
Nilges Draher
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 20, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/20 11:55 AM
Order granting Plaintiff's28 Motion to dismiss without prejudice. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 5/20/2022. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 05/20 11:02 AM
Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Ivan Ray.(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 25, 2022
oth_evt Reassignment of Case - Creation of Fleming Docket Fri 03/25 9:33 AM
Case reassigned to District Judge Charles E. Fleming pursuant to General Order 2022-07. Related document(s)10 ,9 . (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to quash Wed 03/23 1:31 PM
Marginal Entry Order: As Plaintiff Ivan Ray withdrew his March 10, 2022 subpoena to SurePayroll, Inc. in response to Defendants' Motion to Quash (Doc.#24 ), Defendants' Motion to Quash is now moot and hereby withdrawn. Judge John R. Adams on 03/22/2022. Related document26 . (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
26 26 2 pgs notice Notice (atty event) Tue 03/22 9:25 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena to Non-Party Surepayroll, Inc. filed by All Defendants. Related document(s)24 .(Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
25 25 2 pgs notice Notice (atty event) Mon 03/14 10:50 AM
Joint Notice Proposing Dates for Continued Case Management Conference filed by Ivan Ray. (Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
24 24 motion Quash Fri 03/11 2:34 PM
Motion to quash Subpoena to Non-Party Surepayroll, Inc. filed by Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC.(Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Subpoena,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B-Order
adr_ord ADR Administrator received Mediation report Fri 03/11 12:25 PM
Final Mediation Report filed manually with Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Department. Thomas H. Barnard, 23300 South Woodland, Shaker Heights, OH 44122, served as Mediator in the within case. Mediation Conference was held on 2/9/22 and 2/20/22, and as a result, the Mediation process is complete. The case did not settled. The case is returned to the court for further settlement discussions and case processing. ADR Disposition Code: 8. Future ADR: N/A. Related document(s)23 . (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
23 23 adr_ord Notice of Designation of Neutral/Mediator Fri 01/21 9:27 AM
Notice of Designation of Mediator. Mediator to schedule the Mediation Conference and file an electronic notice setting forth the date, time and location of the Mediation. Designated Mediator: Thomas H. Barnard. ADR Hearing to be scheduled on or before 2/25/2022. Report of Mediator Form to be manually filed with the ADR Department no later than 3/11/2022. Report of Mediator Form is attached to the Notice of Designation.(W,CM) (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Report of Mediator Form
Att: 2 (1/21/2022) Corrected Main Document
22 22 adr_ord Neutral conflict response Fri 01/21 8:37 AM
Notice received from First potential neutral regarding conflict. Neutral available: Yes. Related document(s)21 . (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
21 21 adr_ord Neutral conflict tracking Fri 01/14 8:09 AM
Notice sent to potential neutrals regarding conflict check. Neutral Response Form due by 1/21/2022. Related document(s)20 .(B,AL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Neutral Response Form
Thursday, December 30, 2021
20 20 adr_not Agreed Mediation Ranking Sheet filed Thu 12/30 11:59 AM
Agreed Mediation Ranking Information Sheet Filed by Ivan Ray(Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
19 19 adr_ord Notice of Referral to ENE/Mediation - List of potential neutrals sent to parties Tue 12/14 8:56 AM
Notice of Referral to Mediation. List of potential neutrals sent to parties. Agreed Mediation Ranking Sheet due by 12/21/2021. Related document(s)18 .(B,AL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreed Mediation Ranking Sheet,
Att: 2 List of Potential Neutrals
Monday, December 13, 2021
18 18 1 pgs adr_ord Order of Referral to ADR Mon 12/13 3:01 PM
Order of Referral to ADR for Mediation. Signed by Judge John R. Adams. ADR process to be completed by 3/13/2022. (K,C)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 12/13 2:57 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge John R. Adams.Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/13/21. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case referred for mediation. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 7 Mins. (K,C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
17 17 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 12/07 3:09 PM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Ivan Ray. (Nilges, Hans)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
16 16 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 11/10 8:47 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 12/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John R. Adams. Judge John R. Adams on 11/10/2021.(L,J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting,
Att: 2 Local Rule 30.1,
Att: 3 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 4 Budget,
Att: 5 ECF Policies and Procedures
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 11/10 8:32 AM
Ressignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-15. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (S,He)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
15 15 motion Supplement Fri 11/05 2:18 PM
Supplemental Motion to supplement Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay filed by Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC. Related document(s)10 .(Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Supplemental Affidavit
Thursday, September 09, 2021
14 14 9 pgs resp Reply Thu 09/09 1:08 PM
Reply in support of10 Motion to compel arbitration and stay action filed by All Defendants. (Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
13 13 9 pgs resp Opposition Thu 09/02 3:57 PM
Opposition to10 Motion to compel arbitration and stay action filed by Ivan Ray. (Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
12 12 9 pgs resp Reply Thu 08/26 5:50 PM
Reply in support of9 Motion for class certification of an FLSA Collective Action filed by Ivan Ray. (Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
11 11 11 pgs resp Reply Opposition Thu 08/19 3:21 PM
Reply to response to9 Motion for class certification of an FLSA Collective Action , Opposition to9 Motion for class certification of an FLSA Collective Action filed by All Defendants.(Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cody Butzer
10 10 motion Stay Thu 08/19 3:17 PM
Motion to stay action and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC.(Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cody Butzer
Thursday, August 05, 2021
9 9 7 pgs motion Class Certification Thu 08/05 11:54 AM
Motion for class certification of an FLSA Collective Action filed by Plaintiff Ivan Ray.(Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1-Declaration of Ivan Ray,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2-Declaration of Gavin Chew,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 3-Declaration of Darwin Filey,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4-Declaration of D'Michael King,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5-Declaration of Justin Workman
Monday, August 02, 2021
8 8 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 08/02 9:53 AM
Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Ivan Ray.(Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent Form
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
7 7 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/07 3:31 PM
Defendants Hercules Tree Service and Cody Butzer's Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC. (Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 07/07 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Defendants. (Fuller, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Tue 07/06 2:04 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Cody Butzer on 7/1/2021, filed on behalf of Ivan Ray. Related document2 . (O,K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 06/24 10:57 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Hercules Tree Services LLC on 6/17/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Ivan Ray. Related document2 . (S,He)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
3 3 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 06/22 2:44 PM
Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) filed by Ivan Ray.(Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Consent Forms
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
oth_evt Service by Clerk Tue 06/15 1:58 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Cody Butzer Related [+], Hercules Tree Services LLCplaced in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (M,TL)
Related: [-] ceipt #7021 0350 0000 6206 2521ceipt #7021 0350 0000 6206 2538
Friday, June 11, 2021
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 06/11 8:23 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 06/11 8:12 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 06/11 8:12 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/10 5:48 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Cody Butzer, Hercules Tree Services LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10878352.. Filed by Ivan Ray. (Moyle, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons- Hercules Tree Services LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Summons- Cody Butzer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Consent of Ivan Ray