Felowitz v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01752 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 07, 2021 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 to 100
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Dana Felowitz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dana Felowitz(Shafer, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/11 9:19 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Felowitz v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1752-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern California (Sacramento Division) (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 10, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9898687.), filed by Dana Felowitz. Service due by 9/8/2021(sshe, ) |