Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:21-cv-00796
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2021
Terminated:Aug 26, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 08, 2021 12:58 AM PST
Defendant
John Does 1-25
Defendant
Optimum Outcomes Inc
Plaintiff
Amber Romo
Represented By
Raphael Deutsch
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info
Michael Clark Brubaker
Brubaker Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 26, 2021
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Thu 08/26 7:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Amber Romo (Deutsch, Raphael)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/26 1:11 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (PM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Stricken Hearing Fri 07/23 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 10/5/2021. Stricken per7 NOTICE of Settlement.(GT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 07/22 8:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Amber Romo (Deutsch, Raphael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
6 6 service Waiver of Service Fri 06/25 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Optimum Outcomes Inc mailed on 6/17/2021 (Deutsch, Raphael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
5 5 misc JCC-Set Status Conference Tue 06/15 10:45 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Tue 06/15 10:41 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/14 4:16 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
3 3 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/11 1:42 PM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Raphael Deutsch for Plaintiff Amber Romo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/11 1:31 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Raphael Deutsch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Amber Romo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7122765 (Brubaker, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/11 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Optimum Outcomes, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Related [+], filed by Amber Romo.(Brubaker, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7122757
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A