Member Case
Lead case is: 4:21-bk-31948

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:21-bk-31998
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2021
Terminated:Dec 14, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WPG Management Associates, Inc.
180 E Broad St
Columbus, OH 43215-3707
Represented By
Veronica Ann Polnick
Jackson Walker, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/14 12:08 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Tue 12/14 12:10 PM
**An order has been entered in this case directing that all further reporting concerning the administration of the assets and liabilities in this case will occur only in the case of Washington Prime Group Inc., Case No. 21-31948 The docket in Case No. 21-31948 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. ** (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/16 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/16 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Monday, June 14, 2021
3 3 order Joint Administration Mon 06/14 11:30 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 21-31948 Signed on 6/14/2021 (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Mon 06/14 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 06/14 11:31 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-31948 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned/Previous Judge Mon 06/14 11:32 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur is added to the case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones is terminated. (LinhthuDoadi)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 06/14 8:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 21-31998 [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23092024. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 13, 2021
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Sun 06/13 7:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by WPG Management Associates, Inc.. (Polnick, Veronica)
Related: [-]