Utah District Court
Judge:David Barlow
Case #: 2:21-cv-00365
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:2101 Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2021
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 1:46 AM MST
Defendant
Empire Solar Group
Plaintiff
Gage Winters
Represented By
Lauren I. Scholnick
Strindberg Scholnick Birch Hallam Harstad Thorne
contact info
Chad Johnson
Strindberg Scholnick Birch Hallam Harstad Thorne
contact info
Mary E. Olsen
The Gardner Firm PC
contact info
Stuart J. Miller
Lankenau & Miller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 notice Notice From the Court Mon 04/07 8:48 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT. On April 4, 2025, Plaintiff filed20 Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the notice is self-effectuating. The case has been dismissed with prejudice per the terms of the notice. No order will follow. (crk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/07 10:03 AM
Civil Case Terminated. As per Notice 21 from the Court. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Fri 04/04 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters (Olsen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 order Order Tue 04/01 11:34 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER No attached document. On October 31, 2023, the court filed an 18 order staying this litigation and ordering Plaintiff to file notice within 14 days of bankruptcy proceedings being completed. Plaintiff has not responded to the order. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to file a status update on its intent to proceed in the case within 14 days. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 04/01/25. (crk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
order Order Tue 10/31 2:45 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff filed ECF No. 17 giving notice of bankruptcy proceedings initiated by Defendant Empire Solar Group LLC. Pursuant to 11 USC §§ 103(a), 362(a), this litigation is stayed. Because defendant has not appeared, plaintiff is ordered to file notice within 14 days of bankruptcy proceedings being completed. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 10/31/2023. (tcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
utility Case Stayed Fri 09/03 8:22 AM
Case Stayed per17 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY. (jl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
17 17 misc Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Wed 09/01 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default Certificate Tue 08/31 11:36 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Empire Solar Group. (jl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/27 3:28 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:21-cv-00365-DBB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Tue 07/27 3:20 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Because this case is a proposed class action, it is not feasible to obtain consent from all parties to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Additionally, Plaintiff has filed 13 MOTION for Entry of Default on the grounds that the named Defendant has been served with process but has failed to file a timely answer or other response to the complaint. Thus, the named Defendant is unable to consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. For those reasons, the court ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a District Judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/27/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Entry of Default Tue 07/27 2:12 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Empire Solar Group and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/07 9:39 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gage Winters as to All Defendants. (Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
11 11 4 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 06/22 11:01 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 06/22/2021. (jl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
10 10 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 06/16 11:23 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Empire Solar Group. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/16 7:42 AM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary E. Olsen for Gage Winters. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/15/21. (alf)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/16 7:40 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stuart J. Miller for Gage Winters. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/15/21. (alf)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Tue 06/15 10:59 AM
Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary E Olsen , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032408, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
6 6 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Tue 06/15 10:57 AM
Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart J Miller , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032395, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 14, 2021
5 5 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/14 10:31 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying 3 and 4 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Amendments to DUCivR 83-1 became effective on December 1, 2020. Petitioners' motions are denied for failure to comply with DUCivR 83-1.1(c)(1)(A)(i)-(iii). Specifically, the application lacks certification that Petitioners (1) do not maintain law offices in Utah and (2) have not been admitted pro hac vice in any case in this district in the previous 5 years. Petitioners may file renewed motions after reviewing the revised rule and utilizing the new motion form and application form for pro hac vice status available on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/14/2021. No attached document. (lrh)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 06/14 5:19 PM
First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mary E. Olson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032408, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting/Denying Pro Hac Vice Admission
3 3 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Mon 06/14 5:14 PM
First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stuart J. Miller , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4032395, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Gage Winters.(Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting/Denying Pro Hac Vice Admission
2 2 cmp Complaint (Atty) Mon 06/14 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Demand against Empire Solar Group (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4032389) filed by Gage Winters. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Johnson, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Mon 06/14 4:36 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Plaintiff Gage Winters is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)
Related: [-]