New Jersey District Court
Judge:Anne E Thompson
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:21-cv-12479
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2021
Terminated:Apr 12, 2022
Last checked: Friday Dec 10, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
INFOSYS LIMITED
Represented By
FRANCIS A. KENNY
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
LAUREN JILL MARCUS
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
RUBY SRIVASTAVA
15228 KESTRELRISE DRIVE
LITHIA, FL 33547
Represented By
ANDREW BRIAN SMITH
Smith & Schwartzstein LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 04/12 2:55 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Compel; Plaintiffs Complaint1 is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/12/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/12 2:57 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per order13 . (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 12/13 3:35 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by INFOSYS LIMITED re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action (MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 06, 2021
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/06 5:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by RUBY SRIVASTAVA re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel in Opposition to Motion to Compel
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/23 9:36 AM
LETTER ORDER granting the request to adjourn the Motion13 return date until the 12/30/2021. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/23/2021. (jem)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/23 9:37 AM
Reset Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action . Motion set for 12/20/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
14 14 misc Letter Fri 11/19 3:09 PM
Letter from Plaintiff re13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action . (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
13 13 motion Compel Fri 10/29 2:09 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action by All Defendants.(MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Certification,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/29 2:48 PM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Action . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
12 12 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/12 10:53 AM
CONSENT ORDER granting Defendant extension of time to respond to the Complaint; Answer due 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/12/2021. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 10/08 8:18 PM
STIPULATION to extend time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by INFOSYS LIMITED. (KENNY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
10 10 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 09/30 12:08 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer.. (KENNY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 09/30 12:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by INFOSYS LIMITED. (KENNY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/30 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS A. KENNY on behalf of INFOSYS LIMITED (KENNY, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/30 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN JILL MARCUS on behalf of INFOSYS LIMITED (MARCUS, LAUREN)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 09/30 1:10 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INFOSYS LIMITED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/15/2021. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/13 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW BRIAN SMITH on behalf of RUBY SRIVASTAVA (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/13 4:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RUBY SRIVASTAVA. INFOSYS LIMITED served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/15 1:02 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to INFOSYS LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Sent to Plaintiff via USPS on 6/15/2021. (jem)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/15 12:59 PM
Filing fee of $402 received, receipt number NEW044804. (jem)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Tue 06/15 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT filed; see docket entry1 .(jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Mon 06/14 1:32 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jal, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Mon 06/14 10:05 AM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 13, 2021
1 1 service Complaint Received Mon 06/14 10:00 AM
Complaint Received.(jal, ) Modified on 6/14/2021 (jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 EXHIBIT B