Goodman v. Jennmar Sanshell, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-51200
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 5:21-ap-05134 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jennmar Sanshell, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geoffrey S. Goodman, , solely in his capacity as Designee of the Cambrian Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/10 7:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 21-5134 Closed. (rah) |
||
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Geoffrey S. Goodman. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Agreed Order Extending Answer Deadline. (awd) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Proposed Order submitted by T. Kent Barber on behalf of Geoffrey S. Goodman, Jennmar Sanshell, LLC. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer (awd) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Proposed Order submitted by T. Kent Barber on behalf of Geoffrey S. Goodman. (Barber, T.) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
7 | 7
court
Defective Order
Wed 11/17 6:44 AM
Notice of Deficiency This Order is defective and the Court will not consider same until any deficiencies listed below have been corrected. Plaintiff listed in styling of proposed order is incorrect. Filer must correct and refile ONLY the proposed Order using the event code Adversary - Miscellaneous - Proposed Order Submitted. . (awd) |
|
6 | 6
court
Rejected Document(styling)
Wed 11/17 6:42 AM
This document is captioned for a different case. Review the caption of the document and (a) correct to match this case and then refile, or (b) file in the correct case. No further action will be taken on this document. . (awd) |
|
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Extend Time in Which the Defendant May Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Geoffrey S. Goodman. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 06/22 7:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-05134 grs] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 313093, amount $ 350.00. (nak) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (awd) |
|
2 | 2
court
Entry
Wed 06/16 12:56 PM
Entry - See Bankruptcy Case No. 19-51200 (ECF No. 1668) for the Order which establishes procedures re filing fees, summons and orders for trial for this proceeding. (awd) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-05134 Complaint, filed by Geoffrey S. Goodman against Jennmar Sanshell, LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |