New Hampshire District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00099
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2021
Terminated:Mar 23, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 11:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Clemence (1)
Represented By
John P. Newman
Newman Law Office PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kasey A Weiland
Us Attorney'S Office (nh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2023 4:22 PM EDT
Monday, June 07, 2021
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 MOTION TO SEAL AT LEVEL II: CRIMINAL COMPLAINT, SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT, ARREST WARRANT, THIS MOTION, & DOCKET TEXT ENTRIES as to Michael Clemence (1). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest Warrant Issued as to Michael Clemence by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Original warrant and copies to US Marshal and US Probation.(kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Michael Clemence.(kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone as to Michael Clemence (1). Original document available in clerks office.(kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION TO SEAL AT LEVEL II: CRIMINAL COMPLAINT, SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT, ARREST WARRANT, THIS MOTION, & DOCKET TEXT ENTRIES until defendant is taken into custody by USA as to Michael Clemence. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
NOTICE to Attorneys of Record: Defendant taken into custody on 6/7/2021. The case has been unsealed. All future pleadings shall be filed in accordance with this district's Supplemental Rules for Electronic Case Filing. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Clemence. Initial Appearance via Video set for 6/8/2021 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
ENDORSED ORDER as to Michael Clemence approving 5 Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person. Text of Order: APPROVED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: INITIAL APPEARANCE via as to Michael Clemence held on 6/8/2021. Defendant consented to a hearing by video and waived an in-court hearing. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Prosecutor's Brady disclosure obligations confirmed. Show cause hearing regarding indictment set for 7/9/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant ordered temporarily detained pending a preliminary hearing and detention hearing set for 6/11/2021 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel only case management conference to be set for 6/10/2021. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Govt Atty: Kasey Weiland) (Defts Atty: John Newman) (USP: Karin Hess)(Total Hearing Time: 16 min.) (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Clemence. Show Cause Hearing re: Indictment and compliance with 18:3161(b) via Video is set for 7/9/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. HEARING WILL NOT BE NECESSARY IF MOTION TO EXTEND GRANTED OR INDICTMENT RETURNED PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Clemence. In Chambers Case Management Conference (Counsel Only) via Video set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs PUBLIC ACCESS FINDINGS as to Michael Clemence. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John P. Newman appearing for Michael Clemence . Attorney John P. Newman added to party Michael Clemence(pty:dft).(Newman, John) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference and Waiver of Right to Appear in Person for Initial Appearance Fed. R. Crim. P. 5, as to Michael Clemence. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Michael Clemence. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing (in-court) set for 6/11/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Anna Z. Krasinski appearing for USA. Attorney Anna Z. Krasinski added to party USA(pty:pla).(Krasinski, Anna) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
ENDORSED ORDER as to Michael Clemence: Pursuant to FRCrP 5. In compliance with the Due Process Protections Act, the court issues the following Order: Consistent with Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, the United States is ordered to disclose all exculpatory information, in a timely manner, to the defendant. This information includes, but is not limited to, evidence that is material and is favorable to the accused. The failure to discharge this obligation may result in consequences, including the reversal of any conviction, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings and/or sanctions by the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed as to Michael Clemence.(kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: In Chambers Conference via Video as to Michael Clemence held on 6/10/2021. The court granted the government's motion to continue the PC hearing to 6/18/2021 at 1:30 p.m. Rescheduled PC hearing to be held in court. Detention hearing to go forward as scheduled on 6/11/2021. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock) (Govt Atty: Anna Krasinski) (Defts Atty: John Newman)(Total Hearing Time: 10 min.) (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue PC Hearing Scheduled for 6/11/2021 by USA as to Michael Clemence. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting MOTION to Continue PC Hearing Scheduled for 6/11/2021 as to Michael Clemence (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Preliminary Hearing (IN COURT) reset for 6/18/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: DETENTION HEARING as to Michael Clemence held on 6/11/2021. Evidence introduced. Detention hearing continued to 6/18/2021 at 1:30 p.m. (Tape #2:42, 3:24) (Govt Atty: Anna Krasinski) (Defts Atty: John Newman) (USP: Karin Hess)(Total Hearing Time: 48 min.) (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Clemence. Detention Hearing (IN COURT) set for 6/18/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to 6/11/2021 Detention Hearing as to Michael Clemence.(kad) [1:21-mj-00147-AJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
10 10 2 pgs INDICTMENT WITH NOTICE OF FORFEITURE as to Michael Clemence (1) count 1. Original document available in clerk's office.(js) Modified on 6/15/2021 to add: Forfeiture text(js).
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Michael Clemence. (js)
Related: [-]