North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David S Cayer
Case #: 3:21-cv-00290
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: Monday Dec 13, 2021 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Ayanna Bowleg
Represented By
Megan Feltham
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Amy Yager Jenkins
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ian Bowleg
Represented By
Megan Feltham
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Amy Yager Jenkins
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC
Represented By
Megan Feltham
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Amy Yager Jenkins
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC
Represented By
Megan Feltham
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Amy Yager Jenkins
Mcangus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Miranda Hathaway
Represented By
L. Michelle Gessner
Gessnerlaw, PLLC
contact info
Nicole Katherine Haynes
Gessnerlaw, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Thursday, August 18, 2022
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/18 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Pretrial Order Deadlines Wed 06/29 3:16 PM
ORDER sua sponte, as to the trial setting in this matter, which is currently scheduled to begin with docket call on July 11, 2022. Because of the Courts April 18, 2022, Order Granting with Modification the parties Motion to Approve Settlement, (Doc. No. 23), the Court hereby CONTINUES trial in this matter to the mixed term beginning September 12, 2022. ( Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/29/22. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/11 8:19 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicole K. Haynes by Miranda Hathaway. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/11 10:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicole Katherine Haynes terminated. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/11/2022. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
23 23 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion to Stay Mon 04/18 1:51 PM
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Settlement; granting with modification 22 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, all deadlines in this case are STAYED through August 19, 2022. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/18/22. (clc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/18 1:53 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal due by 8/19/2022. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
22 22 motion Settlement Stay Wed 02/02 5:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Motion to Approve Settlement , Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Until Settlement Are Completed Payments are by Miranda Hathaway. Responses due by 2/16/2022 (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement Executed by All Parties
Thursday, January 27, 2022
notice Case Settlement Notice Thu 01/27 9:07 AM
Attorney advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court may dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 2/28/2022. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
21 21 adr Report of Mediation Wed 01/26 8:02 PM
REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Completely Settled. (Dunn, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/17 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Feltham on behalf of Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC (Feltham, Megan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Thu 10/21 12:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by Angela Hathaway. Responses due by 11/4/2021 (Haynes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 10/21 12:18 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Case Caption. Case caption should read Miranda Hathaway, on behalf of herself and all otherssimilarly situated v. Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Ian Bowleg andAyanna Bowleg. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/21/2021. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/07 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Jamyia Coltrane by Angela Hathaway (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Fri 09/10 3:07 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Scheduling Order, by Angela Hathaway. Responses due by 9/24/2021 (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 09/10 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 17 Consent Motion to Amend Class Certification Motion Deadline. Class certification motion deadline extended to 1/31/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/10/2021. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
16 16 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Tue 09/07 3:58 PM
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/7/21. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/01 9:04 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Certify Class CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY A COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FACILITATE NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §216(b) by Angela Hathaway. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/26 10:29 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Certify Class CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY A COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FACILITATE NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §216(b) by Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC. Replies due by 9/2/2021 (Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/24 9:19 AM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 4/20/2022. Motions due by 5/18/2022. Mediation deadline set for 5/9/2022. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/23/21. (clc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 21, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Sat 08/21 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with Word Count by Angela Hathaway re11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
11 11 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 08/17 11:25 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Certify Class CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY A COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FACILITATE NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §216(b) by Angela Hathaway.(Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hathaway Declaration
10 10 3 pgs motion Certify Class Tue 08/17 10:44 AM
MOTION to Certify Class CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY A COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FACILITATE NOTICE PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §216(b) by Angela Hathaway. Responses due by 8/31/2021 (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Collective Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Join
Monday, August 02, 2021
9 9 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Mon 08/02 3:23 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Haynes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Thu 07/15 11:07 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/3/2021. (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/13 11:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/13 11:09 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC (Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/13 11:06 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg, Smallcakes Ballantyne, LLC, Smallcakes Steele Creek, LLC.(Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/13 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Yager Jenkins on behalf of All Defendants (Jenkins, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/23 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Katherine Haynes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Haynes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
3 3 service Summons Reissued Mon 06/21 11:13 AM
Summons Reissued Electronically as to Ayanna Bowleg, Ian Bowleg. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, June 17, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/17 12:26 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/17 12:21 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (js)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Thu 06/17 12:21 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/16 8:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5079165), filed by Angela Hathaway.(Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hathaway Consent to Join