Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00096
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2021
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jun 17, 2021 2:31 AM CDT
Defendant
Bryan Scott Holm (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason T. Griess
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/29/2022 5:25 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
Judge update in case as to Bryan Scott Holm. Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Stephen H. Locher added. (mel)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Bryan Scott Holm (1) count 1. (mel)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT by USA as to Bryan Scott Holm. (mel)
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Grand Jury Presentment as to Bryan Scott Holm held on 6/15/2021. Not Secret. Text Order to be issued. Government requested detention. AUSA present Ryan Wade Leemkuil. CRD: kmp. Time in Court 4:00 p.m. - 4:04 p.m. (mel)
Related: [-]