Iowa Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00038
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jun 18, 2021 2:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Jeremy Keith Heldt (1)
Represented By
Jill M Johnston
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Timothy Lawrence Vavricek
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jul 09 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 1 of the Indictment as to Jeremy Keith Heldt. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/9/2021. (mmc)
GPO Jul 26 2021
ORDER Accepting Report and Recommendation re Plea as to Defendant Jeremy Keith Heldt for 15 Report and Recommendation to Accept Guilty Plea to Count 1 of the Indictment. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/26/2021. (skm)
GPO Dec 08 2021
JUDGMENT as to Defendant Jeremy Keith Heldt Count 1: 8 months imprisonment. 3 years supervised release. $100 special assessment. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/8/2021. (mmc)
GPO Dec 29 2022
REVOCATION Judgment as to Defendant Jeremy Keith Heldt: 24 months imprisonment on Case No. 18cr120-1 & Case No. 21cr38-1 to be served concurrently. No term of supervised release is reimposed. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 12/28/2022. (JLH)

Docket last updated: 06/18/2021 3:46 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
Judge update in case as to Jeremy Keith Heldt. Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts found). (sgw)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT as to Jeremy Keith Heldt (1) Count 1. (eUSA, eUSM, eUSP) (sgw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Indictment