Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00175
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2021
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jun 18, 2021 3:30 AM EDT
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CEDRIC ALEXANDER ARMAN (1)
Terminated: 06/16/2021


Docket last updated: 06/18/2021 4:34 AM EDT
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
1 1 1 pgs USPO Request for Transfer IN of Jurisdiction of SUPERVISED RELEASE from Western District of Texas, filed by Officer Angie Smith as to CEDRIC ALEXANDER ARMAN (1).(DWH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs USPO Memorandum