Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:21-cv-00417
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 15, 2021 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Children's Home of Cincinnati
5050 Madison Road
Cincinnati, OH 45227
Represented By
Roula Allouch
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
contact info
Daniel Edward Burke
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra Harris
7176 Quarterhorse Drive
Springboro, OH 45066
Represented By
Daniel J. Treadaway
Mezibov Butler
contact info
Brian Joseph Butler
Mezibov Butler
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
notice Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/11 5:04 PM
NOTICE TERMINATING DEADLINES/HEARINGS - The Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 1:00 PM is hereby terminated, subject to being reset. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/23 12:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/09 4:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/09 2:20 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sandra Harris of filing Declaration of Sandra Harris and Certified Medical Records (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sandra Harris,
Att: 2 Certified Medical Records
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Fri 12/09 3:11 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting26 Plaintiff's Motion to File Excess Pages, which is unopposed. Plaintiff may file a memorandum in opposition to19 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment that is no more than 25 pages in length. Counsel is referred to Part I.G of the undersigned's Standing Order on Civil Procedures found at https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/9/2022. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
26 26 motion File Excess Pages Thu 12/08 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Notice of Filing Deposition Thu 12/08 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Sandra Harris, Roderick Hinton, Heather Ellison, John Banchy (Exhibits) by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4,
Att: 4 Exhibit 5,
Att: 5 Exhibit 6,
Att: 6 Exhibit 7,
Att: 7 Exhibit 8,
Att: 8 Exhibit 9,
Att: 9 Exhibit 10,
Att: 10 Exhibit 11,
Att: 11 Exhibit 14,
Att: 12 Exhibit 15
24 24 discov Deposition Thu 12/08 11:56 AM
DEPOSITION of John Banchy taken on October 7, 2022 by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Deposition Thu 12/08 11:55 AM
DEPOSITION of Heather Ellison taken on November 8, 2022 by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Deposition Thu 12/08 11:54 AM
DEPOSITION of Roderick Hinton taken on June 21, 2022 by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Deposition Thu 12/08 11:52 AM
DEPOSITION of Sandra Harris taken on June 20, 2022 by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
20 20 discov Notice of Filing Deposition Thu 12/08 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of Sandra Harris, Roderick Hinton, Heather Ellison, John Banchy by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/18 6:41 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Friday, July 29, 2022
18 18 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Fri 07/29 11:44 AM
AMENDED CALENDAR ORDER: Discovery due by 10/14/2022; Dispositive motions due by 11/18/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 1:00 PM in Chambers, Room 239, before Judge Michael R. Barrett; Jury trial set for July, 2023, in Courtroom 109 before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/29/2022. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/13 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 7/13/2022; Brian Butler appeared for plaintiff; Roula Allouch appeared for defendant; case matters discussed; the current calendar is vacated; parties to confer and submit new calendar dates by 7/20/2022. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/06 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that a Status Conference is set for 7/13/2022 at 1:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 9/27/2021 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
med Mediation Minutes Tue 07/05 4:35 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Settlement Conference held 7/5/2022. Matter at impasse. The parties are welcome to contact chambers to re-engage mediation should the parties desire. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
17 17 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 06/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandra Harris by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
16 16 3 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Fri 05/13 9:51 AM
Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 10:00 AM by Zoom for Government before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Unless otherwise ordered, the Settlement Conference shall be held in person in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bowman, Room 706, Potter Stewart United States Courthouse, 100 East Fifth Street, Cincinnati, Ohio. The parties may agree to virtual mediation by Zoom and must inform the Court of this agreement as soon as possible. If one party desires a virtual mediation but an agreement cannot be reached, the desiring party may file a motion requesting a virtual mediation in whole or in part (i.e., one side in person, other side virtual). Such motion must be filed at least 14 days before the mediation with a response due 3 days thereafter. No reply brief will be permitted. In deciding such a motion, the Court will consider the cost of travel, the approximate value of the case, COVID numbers in Hamilton County as well as in the areas from which those traveling from will be coming, and any other facts relevant to the decision . After a good faith assessment of the value of the case, Plaintiff shall submit a demand that is less than the full good faith value of the case to Defendant by 6/3/2022. Defendant, after the same good faith assessment, must then respond with an offer that is greater than zero by 6/17/2022. The parties should thereafter engage in continued settlement discussions in an attempt to resolve the matter prior to the settlement conference . Ex parte settlement statements are due to the Court no later than 6/24/2022 at Noon. Statements shall be submitted directly to chambers either by email at bowman_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov or by fax at (513) 564-7681 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/13/2022. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 04/13 2:21 PM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/13/2022. (kkz)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/13 2:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 4/13/2022; Brian Butler appeared for plaintiff; Roula Allouch appeared for defendant; parties request that matter to be referred to Magistrate Judge for Mediation. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/11 1:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/11/2022; Brian Butler appeared for plaintiff; Roula Allouch appeared for defendant; case matters discussed; parties request additional time to exchange and review discovery; a Status Conference is set for 4/13/2022 at 11:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 9/27/2021 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
14 14 order Protective Order Tue 03/08 4:16 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/8/2022. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Thu 02/24 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati re10 Notice of Withdrawal of Document,9 Stipulation,12 Notice of Withdrawal of Document (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Thu 02/24 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati re10 Notice of Withdrawal of Document Stipulated Protective Order (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Thu 02/24 10:01 AM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket10 Notice of Withdrawal of Document, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket10 Notice of Withdrawal of Document as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/25/2022. (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Wed 02/23 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati re9 Stipulation Protective Order (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 02/18 2:22 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order (Joint) by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/11 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 1/11/2022; Brian Butler appeared for plaintiff; Roula Allouch appeared for defendant; parties request additional time to continue working on targeted discovery; a follow up Status Conference is set for 3/11/2022 at 12:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 9/27/2021 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/21 11:20 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Sandra Harris of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel (Treadaway, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/14 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 10/14/2021; Daniel Treadaway appeared for plaintiff; Roula Allouch appeared for defendant; parties to continue to engage in discovery; a follow up Status Conference is set for 1/11/2022 at 12:30 PM in Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 9/27/2021 for conferencing instructions. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/28 8:46 AM
Reset Deadline re7 Calendar Order: Deadline to file motion for leave to amend the complaint due by 10/21/2021. (kl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
7 7 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 09/27 4:20 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Motions Amend due by 10/21/2302. Motions directed to pleadings due by 10/21/2021. Status Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 10:30 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 1/4/2022. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 2/4/2022. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 4/8/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/22/2022. Discovery due by 7/8/2022. Dispositive motions due by 8/12/2022. Settlement Conference set for 9/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury Trial 3/2023. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/27/2021. (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 09/10 12:54 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Sandra Harris. (Treadaway, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
notice Notice of Deadline Mon 08/23 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/13/2021. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (kkz)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/20 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Burke for Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati (Burke, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/20 1:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/20 1:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Children's Home of Cincinnati. (Allouch, Roula)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/26 3:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Children's Home of Cincinnati on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
misc Docket Annotation Mon 06/21 8:48 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/18 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Children's Home of Cincinnati ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8368190), filed by Sandra Harris. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue