California Central District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-00123
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 12:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Angel Ramos-Corrales (1)
Represented By
Luisa Patricia Tamez
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julius J Nam
Ausa - Us Attorney'S Offce
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/19/2021 1:19 AM PDT
Friday, April 23, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales in violation of 18:48(a)(1). Approved by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Angel Ramos-Corrales (1). (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
4 4 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales; defendants Year of Birth: 2002; date of arrest: 4/26/2021 (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Luisa Patricia Tamez for Angel Ramos-Corrales, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders bail set as: Angel Ramos-Corrales (1) $15,000 Appearance Bond, SEE ATTACHED BOND FOR TERMS AND CONDITIONS. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 6/1/2021 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge in Riverside. Release Order No 39961. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales. (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales. (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales is directed to appear and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 6/1/21 at 10:00 AM in Riverside before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
12 12 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $15,000 by surety: Maria Corrales for Bond and Conditions Filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety (CR-4) filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales re: Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)12 (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (ja) [5:21-mj-00309-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
16 16 INFORMATION filed as to Angel Ramos-Corrales (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in RV. (mhe)
Related: [-]
17 17 PLEA AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales (mhe)
Related: [-]
18 18 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Julius J Nam as to Defendant Angel Ramos-Corrales; defendants Year of Birth: 2002 (mhe)
Related: [-]