Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:21-cr-60149
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Terminated:Oct 19, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 3:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (1)
Represented By
David Scott Markus
Law Offices Of David Markus
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Annika Marie Miranda
United States Attorney'S Office - Sdfl
contact info
Michael N. Berger
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/27/2023 7:09 PM EDT
Thursday, May 06, 2021
Arrest of Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (at) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (1). (tpl) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
Set/Reset Hearings as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade: Initial Appearance set for 5/7/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (tpl) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Scott Markus appearing for Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (Markus, David) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade held on 5/7/2021.. Arraignment set for 5/21/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/12/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 5/21/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 5/21/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 11:36:06-11:51:31) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the obligation of the United States to produce all exculpatory and impeachment evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/7/2021). (at) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
Set/Reset Hearings as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade: Detention Hearing set for 5/12/2021 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 5/12/2021 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (tpl) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
4 4 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Status Re Pretrial Detention and Preliminary Examination as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade held on 5/12/2021., Parties stipulate to pretrial detention with right to revisit. Defense counsel waives preliminary examination hearing. (Arraignment RESET for 5/21/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate., Report Re: Counsel Hearing RESET for 5/21/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate.). Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 11:01:22) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 5/12/2021). (at) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Scott Markus appearing for Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (Markus, David) [0:21-mj-06299-JMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
6 6 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Jesus Felipe Linares Andrade (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4-6. FORFEITURE. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/21/2021) Restricted Unredacted Indictment