USA v. Medina
New Mexico District Court | |
Case #: | 2:21-cr-00713 |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 1:45 AM MDT |
Defendant
Norma Lee Medina (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/19/2021 2:11 AM MDT |
Sunday, December 20, 2020 | ||
Arrest of Norma Medina (cfa) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | ||
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
Set Hearing as to Norma Medina: Initial Appearance set for 12/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (cfa) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | ||
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Norma Lee Medina. Attorney Christopher E. Solis for USA added. (arn) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Lynne Christine McMullen for Norma Lee Medina by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (arn) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | |
3 | 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Initial Appearance as to Norma Lee Medina - True Name - held on 12/22/2020. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Pretrial Services Interview Requested. Appearances: AUSA: Christopher McNair; AFPD: Barbara Mandel; FPD Standing In; Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:29 AM - 9:37 AM. Time In Session: 9:29 AM - 9:37 AM. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt for 12/24/2020, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote, U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (arn) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | |
4 | 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt (arn) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Norma Lee Medina: Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 12/24/2020 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (cfa) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | |
Wednesday, December 23, 2020 | ||
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Richardson, Brenda) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | ||
Thursday, December 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Richardson, Brenda) [2:20-mj-02092-GJF] | ||
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
24 | 24 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bw) | |
26 | 26
![]() |