Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00427
Case Filed:May 20, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Melissa Garza (1)
Represented By
Liana E Gonzales
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Carlos Barreto-Ramirez
Represented By
Rene C Flores
Law Office Of Rene C. Flores
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joel Stacey Dunn
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/19/2021 3:09 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
Arrest of Melissa Garza. (KendraPearsonadi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Melissa Garza (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 4/29/2021 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (NeldaGarcia, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Carlos Barreto-Ramirez as to Melissa Garza. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 4/29/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (NeldaGarcia, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs CJA 20 for Material Witness Carlos Barreto-Ramirez: Appointment of Attorney Rene C Flores for Carlos Barreto-Ramirez as to Melissa Garza ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (NeldaGarcia, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Joel Stacey Dunn appearing for USA, filed.(Dunn, Joel) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) CARLOS BARRETO-RAMIREZ as to Melissa Garza (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 4/29/2021. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Appearances: Roland Swanson, AUSA; Rene Flores f/Material Witness; USM: Pete Lozano. (Digital # 10:49:07-10:57:44) (ERO: Amanda Alegria) (Interpreter: Andres Diaz/used). (KendraPearsonadi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Melissa Garza, (Deft informed of rights) held on 4/29/2021. Defendant will retain counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. Court grants Government's request for continuance. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/4/2021 at 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton. Appearances: Roland Swanson, AUSA; USM: Pete Lozano. (Digital # 10:57:50-11:09:12) (ERO: Amanda Alegria) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (KendraPearsonadi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Melissa Garza. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (KendraPearsonadi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: MINUTE ENTRY re: Preliminary and Detention Hearing as to Melissa Garza held on 5/4/2021. Defendant informs court she was unable to retain counsel and request appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Court appoints counsel and resets Preliminary and Detention Hearing. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton Appearances:AUSA: Patrick Overman.(Digital # 8:57-8:59)(ERO:Sharon Russell) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(AnnSalazar, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Melissa Garza. Liana E Gonzales appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (MichelleHollidayadi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Melissa Garza held on 5/5/2021 Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Defendant waives preliminary hearing in open court. Court may rely upon the complaint as the testimony of the agent for purposes of weighing the evidence during the detention hearing. Defense counsel requests the Court set bond. Government does not oppose bond. Court sets bond. Court sets the following bond conditions: $30KBond / $500 cash deposit.2. The defendant must not violate federal state, or local law while on bond.3. Pretrial Supervision in McAllen, Texas.4. Maintain or actively seek employment. Resume or commence an educational program.5. Surrender passport within 72 hours of release on bond.6. Travel restricted to the McAllen and Brownsville Divisions with permission to travel to Corpus Christi for court related matters. Outside travel to be pre-approved by the U.S. Probation Office.7. Avoid all contact with co-defendant, victims or potential victims.8. Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons.9. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol.10. Refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner.11. Submit to any alcohol/drug testing as directed by the U.S. Probation Office.12. Report Contact with Law Enforcement.13. Defendant agrees to attend all scheduled material witness depositions. Defendant agrees and stipulates that failure to attend scheduled deposition constitutes a knowing forfeiture of the defendant's right to be present during the deposition and amounts to a knowing waiver and forfeiture of the defendant's right to challenge, on any ground, the admissibility of any and all of the deposition testimony at trial and/or sentencing hearing. Defendant is to report to her Attorney within 24 hours of her release. Defendant consents to Court signing bond paperwork on her behalf. Appearances: Christopher Marin, AUSA; Liana Gonzales f/Defendant; USPO: Edward Flores; USM: Chris Askew. (Digital # 9:50-9:54) (ERO: Rochelle Limon) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (AnnSalazaradi, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Bond payment received for Melissa Garza. Payment submitted by Armando Garza in the amount of $500. Receipt number # MCA023808, filed. (lelizondo, 7) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Melissa Garza. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (legarza, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
8 8 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Melissa Garza Receipt # 30,000 APPEARANCE BOND WITH A CASH DEPOSIT OF $500., filed.(legarza, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 UNREDACTED APPEARANCE BOND,
Att: 2 1 pgs AFFIDAVIT OF OWNERSHIP,
Att: 3 UNREDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF OWNERSHIP
Thursday, May 06, 2021
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Melissa Garza, filed. (rrios, 2) [2:21-mj-00494]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
10 10 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Melissa Garza (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (CarrieDickieadi, 6)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
11 11 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Melissa Garza, filed.(CarrieDickieadi, 6)
Related: [-]
12 12 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Melissa Garza. Arraignment set for 5/25/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Drew B. Tipton. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Drew B. Tipton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (CarrieDickieadi, 6)
Related: [-]