Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sheri Polster Chappell
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:21-cv-00473
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2021
Terminated:Aug 13, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Dec 19, 2021 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Barrington South Realty Corp.
Represented By
John D. Agnew
Boy Agnew Potanovic, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Morales
Represented By
Alberto R. Leal
Alberto R. Leal, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
10 10 misc Judgment Wed 09/15 1:07 PM
JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) entered per 9 Order. (JK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
9 9 order Order Fri 08/13 8:45 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement in Principle. (Doc. 8 ). As the parties have settled this action, the Court will administratively close the case and dismiss this action without prejudice. See M.D. Fla. R. 3.09(b). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of a party to move to reopen the case for entry of a stipulated final order or a judgment or for further proceedings on or before September 13, 2021. See M.D. Fla. R. 3.09(b). If no party files an appropriate paper after that deadline, then the Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss the action with prejudice and without further order. The Clerk is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/13/2021. (KRH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of settlement Thu 08/12 3:30 PM
NOTICE of settlement by John Morales (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
7 7 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Tue 07/20 10:08 AM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER - FAST TRACK. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/20/2021. (AEH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/19 9:47 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by BARRINGTON SOUTH REALTY CORP..(Agnew, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
5 5 service Summons returned executed Tue 06/29 4:03 PM
RETURN of service executed on 6/28/2021 by John Morales as to BARRINGTON SOUTH REALTY CORP.. (Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
4 4 order Civil Action Order Tue 06/22 4:15 PM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/22/2021. (LYB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 06/22 4:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to BARRINGTON SOUTH REALTY CORP. (LYB)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 06/22 2:36 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0473-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/22 1:35 PM
COMPLAINT against BARRINGTON SOUTH REALTY CORP. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18390270) filed by John Morales.(Leal, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet