D.P. et al v. School Board of Palm Beach County et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-81099 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 19, 2021 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
Daniel Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Jordan Lauginiger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Johnny Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Howard Blocher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Jose Cuellar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Donald Fennoy, II
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Joseph M. Margolis, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
School Board of Palm Beach County
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Rodney Romano
|
|
Plaintiff
E. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. S.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D. P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Disability Rights Florida
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
W. B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florida State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. B.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. A.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Officer Doe
Terminated: 07/26/2021
|
|
Defendant
Officer Donald Silva
Terminated: 07/26/2021
|
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
210 | 210 ORDER DISMISSING REMAINING CLAIMS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND CLOSING CASE Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) | |
209 | 209 3 pgs FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) | |
208 | 208 1 pgs ORDER ON ACCEPTANCE OF OFFERS OF JUDGMENT re204 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by P. S., D. P.,203 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by W. B., L. H.,205 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by M. S., S. S., R. S.,206 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by E. S., J. S. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) | |
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
207 | 207 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Aileen M. Cannon: Hearing held on June 30, 2023. The Court noted the Notices of Acceptance of Offers of Judgment filed by the nine individual Plaintiffs in this action203 204 205 206 and heard argument from Plaintiff Disability Rights Florida (DRF) on its standing to pursue the remaining claims in the Second Amended Complaint. Order(s) to follow. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Hannah Benton Eidsath (Counsel for Plaintiffs) and Sean Fahey (Counsel for Defendant). Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (aes) | |
206 | 206 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by E. S., J. S. (Boyd, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Appendix Rule 68 Offer Directed at JS and ES | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
205 | 205 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by M. S., R. S., S. S. (Boyd, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Appendix Rule 68 Offer Directed at SS, RS, and MS | ||
204 | 204 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by D. P., P. S. (Boyd, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Appendix Rule 68 Offer Directed at PS and DP | ||
203 | 203 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by W. B., L. H. (Boyd, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Appendix Rule 68 Offer Directed at WB and LH | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
202 | 202 Statement of: Response to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts by W. B., Disability Rights Florida, L. H., D. P., E. S., J. S., M. S., P. S., R. S., S. S. re186 Statement,,(Raben, Carli) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Sharon Wladimirski, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of James Cummings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Alice Farrell, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition of Mary Powell Salisbury, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition of Alexander Lopez, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Deposition of Howard Blocher, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Deposition of Santos (Sam) Carrion | ||
201 | 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re173 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Mark Ruiz filed by W. B., Disability Rights Florida, L. H., D. P., E. S., J. S., M. S., P. S., R. S., S. S..(Boyd, Samuel) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Officer Joseph Margolis, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Report of Dr. Marlene Wong | ||
200 | 200 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re183 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by School Board of Palm Beach County. (Fahey, Sean) | |
199 | 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re180 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial filed by W. B., Disability Rights Florida, L. H., D. P., E. S., J. S., M. S., P. S., R. S., S. S..(Raben, Carli) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition of Michele Lockhart, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of Nickie Zenn, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Robin Griffin-Kitzerow, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition of Frank Fanelli, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Deposition of Robin Griffin-Kitzerow, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix Exhibit Index |