Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Case #: 1:21-cv-22311
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2021
Terminated:Sep 08, 2021
Last checked: Monday Dec 20, 2021 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Jose Angel Casal
Holland & Knight
contact info
Sydney Brooke Alexander
Holland , Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
BANCOR GROUP INC.
Represented By
Diego Perez Ara
Leon Cosgrove LLP
contact info
Derek Eduardo Leon
Leon Cosgrove, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER
Represented By
Diego Perez Ara
Leon Cosgrove LLP
contact info
Derek Eduardo Leon
Leon Cosgrove, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
20 20 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/08 10:27 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Stipulation, ECF No.19 is APPROVED. The above-styled case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 09/07 8:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER (Leon, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/24 5:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Status Report and Reply to Answer re5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,13 Answer to Amended Complaint by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER. Responses due by 9/7/2021(Leon, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/24 5:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting17 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including September 7, 2021, to comply with the Court's Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties, ECF No.5 , and to file a reply to Defendant Eastern National Bank, N.A.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses, ECF No.13 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 08/04 10:48 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion to File Unredacted Copy of the Answer Under Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
14 14 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Tue 08/03 10:36 PM
MOTION to Seal Unredacted Answer and Affirmative Defenses per Local Rule 5.4 by EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A.. (Alexander, Sydney)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/03 10:22 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A.. Attorney Jose Angel Casal added to party EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A.(pty:dft). (Casal, Jose)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
12 12 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 07/15 5:05 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on10 AMENDED/REDACTED COMPLAINT by BANCOR GROUP INC. (jc)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/15 4:00 PM
NOTICE by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER Proof of Service on Eastern National Bank, N.A. (Perez Ara, Diego)
Related: [-]
10 10 29 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 07/15 2:46 PM
AMENDED/REDACTED COMPLAINT against EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A., filed by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER.(jc)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/15 1:05 PM
NOTICE by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER re 7 Order on Expedited Motion Redacted Complaint (Perez Ara, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, July 08, 2021
notice Notice of Compliance Thu 07/08 1:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by sealing ECF No. 1 pursuant to ECF No. 7 Order. (mc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
6 6 2 pgs motion Expedited Motion Wed 07/07 3:29 PM
EXPEDITED MOTION to Seal Complaint re1 Complaint, by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER.(Perez Ara, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Expedited Motion Wed 07/07 5:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Expedited Motion to Seal Complaint. Plaintiffs may re-file a redacted version of the Complaint and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to seal ECF No.1 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
5 5 6 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 06/29 3:34 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 06/28 11:22 AM
ORDER RECUSING JUDGE AND REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Kathleen M. Williams recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/24 8:41 AM
Summons Issued as to EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A. (pes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/23 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against EASTERN NATIONAL BANK, N.A.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14791425, filed by BANCOR GROUP INC., STITCHING PARTICULIER FONDS FRANEKER.(Perez Ara, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 06/24 8:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
Related: [-]