California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:21-cv-01096
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2021
Re-opened:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Mar 30, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 20, 2021 12:57 AM PST
Defendant
Margaret Kang
Defendant
William S. Kang
Plaintiff
John Ho
Represented By
Pamela Tsao
Ascension Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 04, 2022
26 26 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 04/04 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff John Ho. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
25 25 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 03/30 8:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff John Ho. Dismissal is without Prejudice. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Enforce Wed 03/30 11:47 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and Reinstating Case (Doc.20 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Ho is ORDERED to serve the Complaint and this Order on Defendants and to file corresponding proofs of service within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 03/09 5:30 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING Hearing on Plaintiff John Ho's Motion to Enforce Settlement Terms (Doc. 20) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce Settlement Terms (Doc.20 ) is CONTINUED to 4/1/2022 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 03/07 1:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/08 9:18 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby resets the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement20 currently set for March 25, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. to March 25, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
20 20 motion Enforce Wed 10/06 8:06 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce settlement terms or in the alternative enter defendants' default filed by plaintiff John Ho. Motion set for hearing on 3/25/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Pamela Tsao,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Pamela Tsao
Thursday, September 16, 2021
19 19 order For Order Thu 09/16 4:51 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Reopening Case to Enforce Settlement18 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff's request is granted in part. As Plaintiff's previous Notice represented that the matter was settled, the Court will reopen for the limited purpose of enforcing the settlement. Plaintiff shall file his motion to enforce settlement within 21 days of this Order. Any opposition or reply is due in accordance with the Local Rules. Failure to timely file the motion will result in the dismissal of this action and closing of the case without further notice. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
18 18 2 pgs motion Order Thu 09/09 11:09 AM
Second REQUEST for Order for Reinstating Case filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Thu 09/09 9:22 AM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First REQUEST to Reopen Case 15 , for the following reasons: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (2) Counsel shall consult Judge Staton's Procedures and Schedules Page before refiling; Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the efiled document and emailed as a Word document to Judge Staton's generic email addresses (JLS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov). (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
16 16 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 09/03 3:31 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST for Order for Reinstating Case First REQUEST to Reopen Case 15 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (2) Proposed Order shall be filed as separate attachment to the e-filed "NOTICE OF LODGING and/or Request" and e-mailed to a Judge Staton generic email addresses a Microsoft Word version of the document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
15 15 2 pgs motion Order Reopen Case Mon 08/30 11:49 AM
First REQUEST for Order for Reinstating Case , First REQUEST to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
14 14 order Staying Case Fri 07/30 10:13 AM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 7/28/2021, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc.13 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 9/26/2021. Until the Dismissal Date, the Court retains full jurisdiction over this action. All outstanding Orders to Show Cause are discharged. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
13 13 notice Settlement Wed 07/28 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Entire Action filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 18, 2021
12 12 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/19 9:20 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/12 12:25 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Ho, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Employee at Place of Business in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned.(Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
10 10 attorney Change of Address Tue 06/29 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Pamela Tsao attorney for Plaintiff John Ho. Changing attorneys address to 12341 Newport Ave, Suite B200, Santa Ana, CA 92705. Filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 06/28 8:20 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/28 8:20 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/23 4:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Margaret Kang, William S. Kang. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 06/23 4:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 06/23 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 06/23 1:33 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 06/23 1:32 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff John Ho, (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 06/23 1:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/23 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31514299 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff John Ho. (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party John Ho(pty:dft))(Tsao, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A1