Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00124
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jun 24, 2021 2:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Blake Wright (1)
Represented By
Sumter L. Camp, Jr.
Federal Public Defender'S Office (mdtn)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert E. McGuire
U.S. Attorney'S Office (nashville Office)
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2024
JUDGMENT on Sentencing held on 8/12/2024 as to Blake Wright: Plea of guilty to Count 1 of the Indictment. Imprisonment for 18 months. Remanded to custody. Three years supervised release, with conditions. $100 special assessment. Forfeiture of the property described in the Preliminary Order of Forfeiture at Doc. No. 126. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/13/2024. (jm)

Docket last updated: 06/24/2021 3:03 AM CDT
Friday, October 23, 2020
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT filed as to Blake Wright. (jb) (jm). [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/30/2021) Attachment Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 Warrant Issued as to Blake Wright. (jb) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Vincent D. Lewis appearing for USA. (as Co-Counsel) (Lewis, Vincent) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
4 4 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Blake Wright. (Lewis, Vincent) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Blake Wright. USMS is directed to bring defendant from the Montgomery County Jail, 116 Commerce Street, Clarksville, Tennessee 37040, shall be transferred to the custody of the United States Marshal and produced before this Court as soon as is practical, to attend proceedings in this matter; and shall be retained in federal custody pending resolution of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 1/28/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
Arrest of Blake Wright. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Blake Wright. (Lewis, Vincent) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
8 8 Warrant Returned Executed on 3/26/2021 as to Blake Wright. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Appearance as to Blake Wright held on 3/26/2021. Defendant appeared with appointed counsel Sumter L. Camp, Jr. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 3/31/2021 at 1:30 PM. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Blake Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/26/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Blake Wright. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, as amended by the DueProcess Protections Act of 2020, the Court reminds the government of its obligation under Bradyv. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, to disclose evidence favorable to the defendantand material to the defendants guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to produce suchevidence reasonably promptly upon discovery, as required by Local Rule 16.01(a)(3). Failure todo so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, dismissal ofthe indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse juryinstructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any otherremedy that is just under the circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/26/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING as to Blake Wright: Detention and Preliminary Hearing by video set for 3/31/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/26/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
7 7 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Blake Wright re6 MOTION for Detention (Lewis, Vincent) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A - Plea Agreement Case No. 3 11-00012 30
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
14 14 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearings and Extend Filing Deadline by Blake Wright. (Camp, Sumter) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER as to Blake Wright: The unopposed motion of Defendant to continue the March 31, 2021, preliminary and detention hearings filed March 30, 2021, Docket Entry No.14 , is GRANTED. The preliminary and detention hearings are CONTINUED to Thursday, April 8, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. by video conference. The motion also requests an extension of the deadline for defendant to respond to the Government's motion for detention. That request is GRANTED, and Defendant shall file his response on or before April 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/30/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
16 16 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Blake Wright on 3/26/2021. (dt) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
17 17 RESPONSE by Blake Wright re7 Memorandum in Support of Detention (Camp, Sumter) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
18 18 DECLARATION by Blake Wright17 Response (Other) filed by Blake Wright (Camp, Sumter) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Blake Wright held by video conference on 4/8/2021. Defendant released on own recognizance, with conditions. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit and Witness List) (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Blake Wright: Defendant shall appear for a bond review on May 13, 2021, at 4:30 p.m. by videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/8/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
21 21 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 314(c)(3), the release order entered on April 8, 2021 (Docket No.20 ) setting conditions of release is hereby amended to include the following additional conditions: (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/9/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
22 22 ORDER as to Blake Wright: The Court hereby supplements its earlier Release Order and Conditions of Release (Docket No.20 ) with the acknowledgment of Defendant of the conditions of release and the penalties for non-compliance, which further evidences Defendant's promise to obey all conditions of release, to appear as directed, and to surrender to serve any sentence imposed, as stated during the Court's prior hearing. The Clerk shall file the attached signed conditions with acknowledgment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/14/2021. (Attachment: #1 Signed conditions with acknowledgment) (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Blake Wright with acknowledgement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/14/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
24 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (United States' Motion to Suspend the 30-Day Speedy Trial Clock and Exclude Such Time for All Speedy Trial Act Purposes) by USA as to Blake Wright. (Lewis, Vincent) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
25 25 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Government's Motion to Suspend the 30-Day Statutory Speedy Trial Clock and Exclude Such Time for All Speedy Trial Act Purposes (Doc. No.24 ) is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/26/2021. (jb) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
26 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by USA as to Blake Wright. (McGuire, Robert) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
27 27 ORDER as to Blake Wright: United States' Motion to Substitute of Counsel26 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/4/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Status Conference re Bail Review as to Blake Wright held on 5/13/2021. Order to enter. Work condition to be modified. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
29 29 ORDER as to Blake Wright: From discussion during the bond review, the condition of release requiring that Defendant maintain employment with ACG Concrete is modified and replaced with the following condition: Defendant must maintain or actively seek employment and must provide his weekly work schedule in advance to Pretrial Services. The provided work schedule shall include location if Defendant is employed at a job where his work location changes. All other conditions of release remain in place and unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/18/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
30 30 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Petition received from USPO regarding noncompliance by defendant with conditions of pretrial release. A hearing on the petition is set for 6/18/2021 at 2:00PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/15/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
31 31 MOTION to Continue Reset Bond Review Hearing by Blake Wright. (Camp, Sumter) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
32 32 NOTICE of Supplement to Motion to Reset by Blake Wright re31 MOTION to Continue Reset Bond Review Hearing (Camp, Sumter) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Defendant's Motion to Reset Bond Review Hearing31 is GRANTED. The bail review hearing is RESCHEDULED to 1:00 PM, Friday, June 18th. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/17/2021. (jb) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Bond Revocation Hearing as to Blake Wright held on 6/18/2021. Remains on Pretrial Release with modifications. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
35 35 SEALED ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Blake Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/18/2021. (Attachment: #1 Declaration of Potential Third Party Custodian) (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
36 36 ORDER as to Blake Wright: Based on the sworn petition, the testimony of Chianne Golden, and statements made during the bond review hearing, Defendant's conditions of pretrial release are additionally modified as follows: (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/18/2021. (jm) [3:20-mj-02583]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
37 37 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Blake Wright. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (jm)
Related: [-]
38 38 SEALED DOCUMENT: Indictment with grand jury foreperson signature. Document sealed pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Criminal Case Files. THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT FOR PUBLIC DISCLOSURE. (jm)
Related: [-]