Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:21-cv-00852
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2021
Terminated:Mar 10, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 21, 2021 12:48 AM PST
Defendant
Ripl Agency LLC
Represented By
Jonah O. Harrison
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Jeremy E Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ripl Inc
Represented By
Gregory M Krakau
Krakau Law
contact info
Mark Rosencrantz
Carney Badley Spellman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 10, 2022
23 23 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Thu 03/10 10:32 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MW)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/10 10:30 AM
ORDER granting Parties'21 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
21 21 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 03/09 11:30 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff Ripl Inc.(Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 13, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Case Stayed Thu 01/13 10:47 AM
ORDER granting Parties'19 Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Stay . This matter is STAYED until 3/31/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
19 19 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/12 2:34 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Temporary Stay , filed by Plaintiff Ripl Inc. Noting Date 1/12/2022, (Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Temporary Stay
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/13 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures ("Standing Order") [Dkt. No.5 ], the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for the Parties' Stipulated Motion for Temporary Stay [Dkt. No.19 ]. This Minute Order does not strike the stipulated motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court considers the stipulated motion upon filing. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
18 18 order BJR Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedules(FORM) Mon 09/13 9:02 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 3 Days. Jury Trial is set for 10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Joinder of Parties due by 10/12/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/28/2022, Discovery completed by 4/29/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/27/2022, Motions in Limine due by 9/19/2022, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 9/26/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
17 17 misc Joint Status Report Tue 09/07 1:27 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3. (Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
16 16 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/30 1:09 PM
AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ripl Agency LLC (Harrison, Jonah) Modified on 8/30/2021 to include "amended" on the entry, per request of filer. (ST)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/30 10:57 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ripl Agency LLC (Harrison, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/09 12:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Ripl Agency LLC.(Harrison, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Unavailability Thu 07/29 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Jonah O. Harrison for Defendant Ripl Agency LLC from August 23-27, 2021. (Harrison, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
12 12 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 07/27 9:28 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/24/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/23 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeremy E Roller on behalf of Defendant Ripl Agency LLC. (Roller, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/23 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonah O. Harrison on behalf of Defendant Ripl Agency LLC. (Harrison, Jonah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Thu 07/22 10:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ripl Agency on 7/3/2021, filed by Plaintiff Ripl Inc. (Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
8 8 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/30 11:13 AM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gregory M Krakau for Plaintiff Ripl Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
7 7 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Tue 06/29 2:29 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/29 11:13 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ripl Inc (Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
5 5 misc BJR Standing Order (FORM) Mon 06/28 9:50 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/25 3:48 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ripl Agency LLC (SG)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 06/25 3:44 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/25 9:59 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gregory M. Krakau FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff RIPL, INC. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7140223 (Rosencrantz, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 06/25 3:38 PM
Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 06/25 3:43 PM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/2/2021. (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/24 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) RIPL, INC. Attorney Mark Rosencrantz added to party RIPL, INC.(pty:pla), filed by RIPL, INC..(Rosencrantz, Mark) (FEE PAID, Receipt No AWAWDC 7139169) Modified on 6/24/2021 to reflect filing fee paid (MET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons