Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Durkin
Referred: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Case #: 1:21-cv-03415
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
Data Interfuse LLC
a Virginia Limited liability company 344 MAPLE AVENUE, WEST SUITE 237
Vienna, VA 22180
Represented By
Andrew H Schrag
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Paul H. Tzur
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Scott Gregory Herrman
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Lovegrove
Represented By
Andrew H Schrag
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Paul H. Tzur
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Scott Gregory Herrman
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OTR Transportation, Inc.
an Illinois Corporation 333 S WABASH AVE STE 2700
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Thomas P. Yardley
Robbins, Salomon & Patt, Ltd.
contact info
Christine Rhae Walsh
Robbins, Salomon & Patt, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants' Motion to Compel and Partially Stay Discovery (ECF No. 25) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 2/1/2022. Mailed notice(ber, )
GPO Jan 17 2023
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, OTR's motion to dismiss 61 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted in that Count III, IV, V, VI, and VII of Data Interfuse's counterclaims are dismissed. The motion is denied with respect to Count II. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/17/2023. Mailed notice. (ecw, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.